Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1450 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 30, 2011      TO: Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1450 by Guillen ( Relating to a study regarding tort liability arising from a volunteer's operation of a Parks and Wildlife Department vehicle.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would require the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department (TPWD) to conduct a study relating to tort liability arising from volunteer services.  TPWD would need to consult with various entities in conducting the study, including the Office of the Attorney General.  The study would be submitted to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker and other legislators no later than December 1, 2012.  This analysis assumes costs of conducting and issuing the study can be absorbed within TPWDs existing resources.  Accordingly, no significant fiscal implication is anticipated. The bill provisions would expire on September 1, 2013.  The bill would take immediate effect if the bill receives two-thirds the vote of all members in both houses.  Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:802 Parks and Wildlife Department   LBB Staff:  JOB, TB, KM    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 30, 2011





  TO: Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1450 by Guillen ( Relating to a study regarding tort liability arising from a volunteer's operation of a Parks and Wildlife Department vehicle.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1450 by Guillen ( Relating to a study regarding tort liability arising from a volunteer's operation of a Parks and Wildlife Department vehicle.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism 

 Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1450 by Guillen ( Relating to a study regarding tort liability arising from a volunteer's operation of a Parks and Wildlife Department vehicle.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB1450 by Guillen ( Relating to a study regarding tort liability arising from a volunteer's operation of a Parks and Wildlife Department vehicle.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would require the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department (TPWD) to conduct a study relating to tort liability arising from volunteer services.  TPWD would need to consult with various entities in conducting the study, including the Office of the Attorney General.  The study would be submitted to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Speaker and other legislators no later than December 1, 2012.  This analysis assumes costs of conducting and issuing the study can be absorbed within TPWDs existing resources.  Accordingly, no significant fiscal implication is anticipated. The bill provisions would expire on September 1, 2013.  The bill would take immediate effect if the bill receives two-thirds the vote of all members in both houses.  Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 802 Parks and Wildlife Department

802 Parks and Wildlife Department

LBB Staff: JOB, TB, KM

 JOB, TB, KM