Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1469 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hernandez Luna (Senate Sponsor - Gallegos) H.B. No. 1469
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to exempting certain fraternal and veterans organizations
 from certain bond requirements to obtain an alcoholic beverage
 permit or license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.61, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b-2)  Subsection (b-1) does not apply to a fraternal
 organization or veterans organization, as those terms are defined
 by Section 32.11.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *