Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1476 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 18, 2011      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1476 by Riddle (Relating to the grounds for revocation of an emergency medical services personnel certification.), As Engrossed   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1476, As Engrossed: a positive impact of $901,000 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 18, 2011





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1476 by Riddle (Relating to the grounds for revocation of an emergency medical services personnel certification.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1476 by Riddle (Relating to the grounds for revocation of an emergency medical services personnel certification.), As Engrossed

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1476 by Riddle (Relating to the grounds for revocation of an emergency medical services personnel certification.), As Engrossed

HB1476 by Riddle (Relating to the grounds for revocation of an emergency medical services personnel certification.), As Engrossed

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1476, As Engrossed: a positive impact of $901,000 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1476, As Engrossed: a positive impact of $901,000 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2012 $901,000   2013 $0   2014 $0   2015 $0   2016 $0    


2012 $901,000
2013 $0
2014 $0
2015 $0
2016 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2012 $1,815,250 ($914,250)   2013 $0 $0   2014 $0 $0   2015 $0 $0   2016 $0 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2012 $1,815,250 ($914,250)   2013 $0 $0   2014 $0 $0   2015 $0 $0   2016 $0 $0  


2012 $1,815,250 ($914,250)
2013 $0 $0
2014 $0 $0
2015 $0 $0
2016 $0 $0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill amends Section 773.0614(c), Health and Safety Code to specify that emergency medical services (EMS) personnels certification shall be revoked if the certificate holder has been convicted of or placed on deferred adjudication community supervision or deferred disposition for certain criminal offenses. Currently statute states that EMS personnels certification shall be revoked if the certificate holder is convicted of or placed on deferred adjudication community supervision or deferred disposition. The bill would take effect September 1, 2011. 

Methodology

According to the Department of State Health Services (DSHS), to verify if a person has been convicted of or placed on deferred adjudication community supervision or deferred disposition as stated in the bill, DSHS would have to require all EMS personnel certified prior to January 1, 2010 when DSHS began requiring fingerprint-based criminal history checks for all initial applicants, to get criminal history checks, including Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) fingerprint-based checks and the results of these checks would have to be evaluated by DSHS staff.  The Department of Public Safety (DPS) would conduct these criminal history checks. DSHS estimates that approximately 53,000 EMS personnel would be impacted by this provision.  It is assumed that all of these fingerprint-based criminal history checks would be done in fiscal year 2012, which would result in a total increase in revenue of $1,815,250 in this fiscal year from the $34.25 fee collected for the checks paid directly to DPS by the EMS personnel. However, a portion of this fee revenue, $17.25 per check, is returned to the FBI for professional services as required by federal statute; which would result in a cost of $914,250 in fiscal year 2012. DSHS and DPS anticipate being able to absorb any additional administrative costs associated with this provision within existing agency resources. 

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 405 Department of Public Safety, 537 State Health Services, Department of, 116 Sunset Advisory Commission

405 Department of Public Safety, 537 State Health Services, Department of, 116 Sunset Advisory Commission

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, MB, JF, KKR, KM, NB

 JOB, CL, MB, JF, KKR, KM, NB