Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1478 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 6, 2011      TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1478 by Woolley (Relating to the extension of the women's health program demonstration project.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1478, As Introduced: a positive impact of $83,738,684 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 6, 2011





  TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1478 by Woolley (Relating to the extension of the women's health program demonstration project.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1478 by Woolley (Relating to the extension of the women's health program demonstration project.), As Introduced

 Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health 

 Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1478 by Woolley (Relating to the extension of the women's health program demonstration project.), As Introduced

HB1478 by Woolley (Relating to the extension of the women's health program demonstration project.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1478, As Introduced: a positive impact of $83,738,684 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1478, As Introduced: a positive impact of $83,738,684 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2012 $39,575,868   2013 $44,162,816   2014 $15,938,115   2015 $0   2016 $0    


2012 $39,575,868
2013 $44,162,816
2014 $15,938,115
2015 $0
2016 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromFederal Funds555    2012 $39,575,868 $24,880,668   2013 $44,162,816 $25,956,988   2014 $15,938,115 $9,321,926   2015 $0 $0   2016 $0 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromFederal Funds555    2012 $39,575,868 $24,880,668   2013 $44,162,816 $25,956,988   2014 $15,938,115 $9,321,926   2015 $0 $0   2016 $0 $0  


2012 $39,575,868 $24,880,668
2013 $44,162,816 $25,956,988
2014 $15,938,115 $9,321,926
2015 $0 $0
2016 $0 $0

Fiscal Analysis

This bill would implement a recommendation in the report "Continue and Expand the Texas Medicaid Women's Health Program to Maximize Federal Funds and State Savings" in the Legislative Budget Board's Government Effectiveness and Efficiency Report, submitted to the Eighty-second Texas Legislature, 2011. The bill would direct the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to continue the Medicaid Women's Health Program through September 1, 2021. The Act would take effect immediately if it received a two-thirds vote of each house, otherwise, it would take effect August 31, 2011.

This bill would implement a recommendation in the report "Continue and Expand the Texas Medicaid Women's Health Program to Maximize Federal Funds and State Savings" in the Legislative Budget Board's Government Effectiveness and Efficiency Report, submitted to the Eighty-second Texas Legislature, 2011.

The bill would direct the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to continue the Medicaid Women's Health Program through September 1, 2021.

The Act would take effect immediately if it received a two-thirds vote of each house, otherwise, it would take effect August 31, 2011.

Methodology

To continue the Women's Health Program, HHSC must prepare a waiver renewal, obtain federal approval, and adopt rules. This estimate assumes all start-up activities can be accomplished by August 31, 2011. The savings shown above are based on HHSC's estimate of continuing the waiver and are net of the cost of providing women's health services. Because the waiver would statutorily expire on September 1, 2011, twelve months of savings are assumed in both fiscal years 2012 and 2013. HHSC assumed that beginning January 1, 2014, women's health services would be available through the expanded coverage provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA), and therefore, savings shown from the waiver are only for the first four months of fiscal year 2014. Savings after this date would accrue to the program that replaces the Women's Health Program. Savings from the continuation of the Women's Health Program are assumed in House Bill 1 as introduced.

To continue the Women's Health Program, HHSC must prepare a waiver renewal, obtain federal approval, and adopt rules. This estimate assumes all start-up activities can be accomplished by August 31, 2011.

The savings shown above are based on HHSC's estimate of continuing the waiver and are net of the cost of providing women's health services. Because the waiver would statutorily expire on September 1, 2011, twelve months of savings are assumed in both fiscal years 2012 and 2013. HHSC assumed that beginning January 1, 2014, women's health services would be available through the expanded coverage provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA), and therefore, savings shown from the waiver are only for the first four months of fiscal year 2014. Savings after this date would accrue to the program that replaces the Women's Health Program.

Savings from the continuation of the Women's Health Program are assumed in House Bill 1 as introduced.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 537 State Health Services, Department of

529 Health and Human Services Commission, 537 State Health Services, Department of

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, JI, BH

 JOB, CL, JI, BH