H.B. No. 1545 AN ACT relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to change the date of their general elections. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Sections 41.0052(a) and (a-1), Election Code, are amended to read as follows: (a) [The governing body of a political subdivision other than a county may, not later than December 31, 2005, change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to another authorized uniform election date. [(a-1)] The governing body of a political subdivision, other than a county, that holds its general election for officers on a date other than the November uniform election date may, not later than December 31, 2012 [2010], change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to the November uniform election date. SECTION 2. Section 41.0053, Election Code, is repealed. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1545 was passed by the House on April 26, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1545 was passed by the Senate on May 17, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor