Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1555 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1555


 AN ACT
 relating to the first day of instruction in certain school
 districts that provide additional days of instruction financed with
 local funds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.0811(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by this section, a [A] school
 district may not begin instruction for students for a school year
 before the fourth Monday in August. A school district may:
 (1)  begin instruction for students for a school year
 before the fourth Monday in August if [unless] the district
 operates a year-round system under Section 25.084; or
 (2)  begin instruction for students for a school year
 on or after the first Monday in August at a campus or at not more
 than 20 percent of the campuses in the district if:
 (A)  the district has a student enrollment of
 190,000 or more;
 (B)  the district at the beginning of the school
 year provides, financed with local funds, days of instruction for
 students at the campus or at each of the multiple campuses, in
 addition to the minimum number of days of instruction required
 under Section 25.081;
 (C)  the campus or each of the multiple campuses
 are undergoing comprehensive reform, as determined by the board of
 trustees of the district; and
 (D)  a majority of the students at the campus or at
 each of the multiple campuses are educationally disadvantaged.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1555 was passed by the House on April
 7, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1555 on May 5, 2011, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1555 on May 19, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1555 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 2, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1555 on May 23, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor