Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1621 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 9, 2011      TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1621 by Truitt (relating to the licensing and regulation of diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; providing penalties.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would add a chapter to the Health and Safety Code requiring the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) to license and regulate diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; exemptions are provided.  The bill would require that the executive commissioner of HHSC to adopt rules necessary to implement the chapter no later than January 1, 2012.  A facility would not be required to hold a license under the chapter until March 1, 2012. Subchapters relating to general enforcement and administrative penalties would take effect September 1, 2012; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011. This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either with or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current legislature. According to DSHS, the bill exempts all facilities that would be licensed under the provisions of the bill. It is assumed the adoption of rules would be accomplished using existing resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:537 State Health Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  JOB, CL, VJC, SD, MB, NB    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 9, 2011





  TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1621 by Truitt (relating to the licensing and regulation of diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; providing penalties.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1621 by Truitt (relating to the licensing and regulation of diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; providing penalties.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health 

 Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1621 by Truitt (relating to the licensing and regulation of diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; providing penalties.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB1621 by Truitt (relating to the licensing and regulation of diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; providing penalties.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would add a chapter to the Health and Safety Code requiring the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) to license and regulate diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; exemptions are provided.  The bill would require that the executive commissioner of HHSC to adopt rules necessary to implement the chapter no later than January 1, 2012.  A facility would not be required to hold a license under the chapter until March 1, 2012. Subchapters relating to general enforcement and administrative penalties would take effect September 1, 2012; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011. This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either with or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current legislature. According to DSHS, the bill exempts all facilities that would be licensed under the provisions of the bill. It is assumed the adoption of rules would be accomplished using existing resources.

The bill would add a chapter to the Health and Safety Code requiring the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) to license and regulate diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; exemptions are provided. 

The bill would require that the executive commissioner of HHSC to adopt rules necessary to implement the chapter no later than January 1, 2012.  A facility would not be required to hold a license under the chapter until March 1, 2012. Subchapters relating to general enforcement and administrative penalties would take effect September 1, 2012; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011. This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either with or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current legislature.

According to DSHS, the bill exempts all facilities that would be licensed under the provisions of the bill. It is assumed the adoption of rules would be accomplished using existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 537 State Health Services, Department of

537 State Health Services, Department of

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, VJC, SD, MB, NB

 JOB, CL, VJC, SD, MB, NB