LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION May 9, 2011 TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE:HB1621 by Truitt (relating to the licensing and regulation of diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; providing penalties.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated. The bill would add a chapter to the Health and Safety Code requiring the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) to license and regulate diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; exemptions are provided. The bill would require that the executive commissioner of HHSC to adopt rules necessary to implement the chapter no later than January 1, 2012. A facility would not be required to hold a license under the chapter until March 1, 2012. Subchapters relating to general enforcement and administrative penalties would take effect September 1, 2012; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011. This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either with or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current legislature. According to DSHS, the bill exempts all facilities that would be licensed under the provisions of the bill. It is assumed the adoption of rules would be accomplished using existing resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated. Source Agencies:537 State Health Services, Department of LBB Staff: JOB, CL, VJC, SD, MB, NB LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION May 9, 2011 TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE:HB1621 by Truitt (relating to the licensing and regulation of diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; providing penalties.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted TO: Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE: HB1621 by Truitt (relating to the licensing and regulation of diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; providing penalties.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health Honorable Lois W. Kolkhorst, Chair, House Committee on Public Health John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board HB1621 by Truitt (relating to the licensing and regulation of diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; providing penalties.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted HB1621 by Truitt (relating to the licensing and regulation of diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; providing penalties.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated. No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated. The bill would add a chapter to the Health and Safety Code requiring the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) to license and regulate diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; exemptions are provided. The bill would require that the executive commissioner of HHSC to adopt rules necessary to implement the chapter no later than January 1, 2012. A facility would not be required to hold a license under the chapter until March 1, 2012. Subchapters relating to general enforcement and administrative penalties would take effect September 1, 2012; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011. This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either with or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current legislature. According to DSHS, the bill exempts all facilities that would be licensed under the provisions of the bill. It is assumed the adoption of rules would be accomplished using existing resources. The bill would add a chapter to the Health and Safety Code requiring the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) to license and regulate diagnostic imaging facilities and fluoroscopy-guided pain management procedure centers; exemptions are provided. The bill would require that the executive commissioner of HHSC to adopt rules necessary to implement the chapter no later than January 1, 2012. A facility would not be required to hold a license under the chapter until March 1, 2012. Subchapters relating to general enforcement and administrative penalties would take effect September 1, 2012; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011. This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either with or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current legislature. According to DSHS, the bill exempts all facilities that would be licensed under the provisions of the bill. It is assumed the adoption of rules would be accomplished using existing resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated. Source Agencies: 537 State Health Services, Department of 537 State Health Services, Department of LBB Staff: JOB, CL, VJC, SD, MB, NB JOB, CL, VJC, SD, MB, NB