Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1646 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gallego (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 1646
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 16, 2011;
 May 16, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 23, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1646 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to representation of certain applicants for writs of
 habeas corpus in cases involving the death penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 6, Article 11.071, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to read
 as follows:
 (b-1)  If the convicting court receives notice that the
 requirements of Section 5(a) for consideration of a subsequent
 application have been met and if the applicant has not elected to
 proceed pro se and is not represented by retained counsel, the
 convicting court shall appoint, in order of priority:
 (1)  the attorney who represented the applicant in the
 proceedings under Section 5, if the attorney seeks the appointment;
 (2)  the office of capital writs, if the office
 represented the applicant in the proceedings under Section 5 or
 otherwise accepts the appointment; or
 (3)  counsel from a list of competent counsel
 maintained by the presiding judges of the administrative judicial
 regions under Section 78.056, Government Code, if the office of
 capital writs:
 (A)  did not represent the applicant as described
 by Subdivision (2); or
 (B)  does not accept or is prohibited from
 accepting the appointment under Section 78.054, Government Code.
 (b-2)  Regardless of whether the subsequent application is
 ultimately dismissed, compensation and reimbursement of expenses
 for counsel appointed under Subsection (b-1) shall be provided as
 described by Section 2, 2A, or 3, including compensation for time
 previously spent and reimbursement of expenses previously incurred
 with respect to the subsequent application.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 subsequent application for a writ of habeas corpus filed on or after
 January 1, 2012. A subsequent application filed before January 1,
 2012, is covered by the law in effect when the application was
 filed, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *