82R7591 SGA-F By: Rodriguez H.B. No. 1677 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the administration and funding of retirement systems for firefighters in certain municipalities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 2.03(b), Chapter 183 (S.B. 598), Acts of the 64th Legislature, Regular Session, 1975 (Article 6243e.1, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), is amended to read as follows: (b) Between November 1 of each year and the first Monday in January of the following year, the board of trustees shall hold an election to elect one member of the board of trustees. If only one firefighter or retiree is nominated for a position under Subsection (c) of this section, instead of holding an election, the board of trustees may appoint the sole nominated candidate at the first board meeting in January. The board shall adopt procedures for the appointment of a sole nominated candidate under this subsection. A board member appointed under this subsection is considered elected for purposes of this Act. SECTION 2. Sections 10.01(a) and (b), Chapter 183 (S.B. 598), Acts of the 64th Legislature, Regular Session, 1975 (Article 6243e.1, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), are amended to read as follows: (a) Each municipality in which a fire department to which this Act applies is located shall appropriate and contribute to the fund an amount equal to a percentage [18.05 percent] of the compensation of all members during that month as follows: (1) 19.05 percent, beginning on the first pay date following September 30, 2010, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2011; (2) 20.05 percent, beginning on the first pay date following September 30, 2011, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2012; (3) 21.05 percent, for 24 pay dates of the municipality beginning on the first pay date following September 30, 2012; and (4) 22.05 percent, for all pay dates of the municipality that follow the 24 pay dates referenced in Subdivision (3) of this subsection. (b) Each firefighter shall pay into the fund each month a percentage [13.70 percent] of the firefighter's compensation for that month as follows: (1) 15.70 percent, for the pay dates of the municipality following September 30, 2010, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2011; (2) 16.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2011, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2012; (3) 16.70 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2012, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2013; (4) 17.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2013, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2014; (5) 17.70 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2014, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2015; (6) 18.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2015, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2016; and (7) 18.70 percent, for the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2016, and all subsequent pay dates of the municipality. SECTION 3. The board of trustees of a retirement system subject to this Act shall adopt procedures required under Section 2.03(b), Chapter 183 (S.B. 598), Acts of the 64th Legislature, Regular Session, 1975 (Article 6243e.1, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), as amended by this Act, before a sole nominated candidate may be appointed to the board of trustees. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.