Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1711 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: J. Davis of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Jackson) H.B. No. 1711
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 2, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Economic
 Development; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to disaster remediation contracts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 4, Business & Commerce Code, is amended by
 adding Chapter 57 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 57. DISASTER REMEDIATION CONTRACTS
 Sec. 57.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Disaster remediation" means the removal,
 cleaning, sanitizing, demolition, reconstruction, or other
 treatment of improvements to real property performed because of
 damage or destruction to that property caused by a natural
 disaster.
 (2)  "Disaster remediation contractor" means a person
 who engages in disaster remediation for compensation, other than a
 person who has a permit, license, registration, or other
 authorization from the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 for the collection, transportation, treatment, storage,
 processing, or disposal of solid waste.
 (3)  "Natural disaster" means the occurrence of
 widespread or severe damage, injury, or loss of life or property
 related to any natural cause, including fire, flood, earthquake,
 wind, storm, or wave action, that results in a disaster declaration
 by the governor under Chapter 418, Government Code.
 (4)  "Person" means an individual, corporation, trust,
 partnership, association, or other private legal entity.
 Sec. 57.002.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. (a) Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), this chapter applies to a contract
 between a person and a disaster remediation contractor for the
 performance of disaster remediation services on property owned or
 leased by the person.
 (b)  This chapter does not apply to a contract between a
 person and a disaster remediation contractor for the performance of
 disaster remediation services on property owned or leased by the
 person if the contractor maintains for at least one year preceding
 the date of the contract a physical business address in:
 (1)  the county in which the property is located; or
 (2)  a county adjacent to the county in which the
 property is located.
 Sec. 57.003.  DISASTER REMEDIATION CONTRACT REQUIREMENTS;
 CERTAIN CONDUCT PROHIBITED.  (a)  A contract subject to this chapter
 must be in writing.
 (b)  A disaster remediation contractor:
 (1)  may not require a person to make a full or partial
 payment under a contract before the contractor begins work;
 (2)  may not require that the amount of any partial
 payment under the contract exceed an amount reasonably
 proportionate to the work performed, including any materials
 delivered; and
 (3)  shall include in any contract for disaster
 remediation services the following statement in conspicuous,
 boldfaced type of at least 10 points in size: "This contract is
 subject to Chapter 57, Business & Commerce Code. A contractor may
 not require a full or partial payment before the contractor begins
 work and may not require partial payments in an amount that exceeds
 an amount reasonably proportionate to the work performed, including
 any materials delivered."
 Sec. 57.004.  DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICE. A violation of this
 chapter by a disaster remediation contractor is a false,
 misleading, or deceptive act or practice as defined by Section
 17.46(b), and any remedy under Subchapter E, Chapter 17, is
 available for a violation of this chapter.
 Sec. 57.005.  WAIVER OF CHAPTER PROHIBITED. A person may not
 waive this chapter by contract or other means.  A purported waiver
 of this chapter is void.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a contract for the performance of disaster remediation services
 that is entered into on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 contract entered into before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the contract was entered
 into, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *