H.B. No. 1732 AN ACT relating to the provision by the Texas Water Development Board of financial assistance for certain projects. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 15.975, Water Code, is amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows: (d) The board may not approve an application if the applicant has failed to satisfactorily complete a request by the executive administrator or a regional planning group for information relevant to the project, including a water infrastructure financing survey under Section 16.053(q). SECTION 2. Section 15.912, Water Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 15.912. CONSIDERATIONS IN ACTING ON APPLICATION. (a) In acting on an application for financial assistance, the board shall consider: (1) the needs of the area to be served by the project and the benefit of the project to the area in relation to the needs of other areas requiring state assistance in any manner and the benefits of those projects to the other areas; (2) the availability of revenue to the political subdivision or water supply corporation from all sources for any necessary repayment of the cost of the project, including all interest; (3) the relationship of the project to overall statewide needs; and (4) any other factors that the board considers relevant. (b) The board may not accept an application for a loan or grant of financial assistance from the fund for a project recommended through the state and regional water planning processes under Sections 16.051 and 16.053 if the applicant has failed to satisfactorily complete a request by the executive administrator or a regional planning group for information relevant to the project, including a water infrastructure financing survey under Section 16.053(q). SECTION 3. Section 16.131, Water Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 16.131. AUTHORIZED PROJECTS. (a) The board may use the state participation account of the development fund to encourage optimum regional development of projects including the design, acquisition, lease, construction, reconstruction, development, or enlargement in whole or part of: (1) reservoirs and storm water retention basins for water supply, flood protection, and groundwater recharge; (2) facilities for the transmission and treatment of water; and (3) treatment works as defined by Section 17.001 [of this code]. (b) The board may not use the state participation account of the development fund to finance a project recommended through the state and regional water planning processes under Sections 16.051 and 16.053 if the applicant has failed to satisfactorily complete a request by the executive administrator or a regional planning group for information relevant to the project, including a water infrastructure financing survey under Section 16.053(q). SECTION 4. Section 17.003, Water Code, is amended by adding Subsections (c), (d), (e), and (f) to read as follows: (c) Water financial assistance bonds that have been authorized but have not been issued are not considered to be state debt payable from the general revenue fund for purposes of Section 49-j, Article III, Texas Constitution, until the legislature makes an appropriation from the general revenue fund to the board to pay the debt service on the bonds. (d) In requesting approval for the issuance of bonds under this chapter, the executive administrator shall certify to the bond review board whether the bonds are reasonably expected to be paid from: (1) the general revenues of the state; or (2) revenue sources other than the general revenues of the state. (e) The bond review board shall verify whether debt service on bonds to be issued by the board under this chapter is state debt payable from the general revenues of the state, in accordance with the findings made by the board in the resolution authorizing the issuance of the bonds and the certification provided by the executive administrator under Subsection (d). (f) Bonds issued under this chapter that are designed to be paid from the general revenues of the state shall cease to be considered bonds payable from those revenues if: (1) the bonds are backed by insurance or another form of guarantee that ensures payment from a source other than the general revenues of the state; or (2) the board demonstrates to the satisfaction of the bond review board that the bonds no longer require payment from the general revenues of the state and the bond review board so certifies to the Legislative Budget Board. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1732 was passed by the House on April 6, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 1732 on May 25, 2011, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 1732 on May 28, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 1, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1732 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 23, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 1732 on May 28, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor