Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1732 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ritter (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1732
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 7, 2011;
 April 14, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Finance; May 20, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 1;
 May 20, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1732 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of the constitutional limit on state
 debt payable from the general revenues of the state to bonds issued
 by the Texas Water Development Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 17.003, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (c), (d), (e), and (f) to read as follows:
 (c)  Water financial assistance bonds that have been
 authorized but have not been issued are not considered to be state
 debt payable from the general revenue fund for purposes of Section
 49-j, Article III, Texas Constitution, until the legislature makes
 an appropriation from the general revenue fund to the board to pay
 the debt service on the bonds.
 (d)  In requesting approval for the issuance of bonds under
 this chapter, the executive administrator shall certify to the bond
 review board whether the bonds are reasonably expected to be paid
 from:
 (1)  the general revenues of the state; or
 (2)  revenue sources other than the general revenues of
 the state.
 (e)  The bond review board shall verify whether debt service
 on bonds to be issued by the board under this chapter is state debt
 payable from the general revenues of the state, in accordance with
 the findings made by the board in the resolution authorizing the
 issuance of the bonds and the certification provided by the
 executive administrator under Subsection (d).
 (f)  Bonds issued under this chapter that are designed to be
 paid from the general revenues of the state shall cease to be
 considered bonds payable from those revenues if:
 (1)  the bonds are backed by insurance or another form
 of guarantee that ensures payment from a source other than the
 general revenues of the state; or
 (2)  the board demonstrates to the satisfaction of the
 bond review board that the bonds no longer require payment from the
 general revenues of the state and the bond review board so certifies
 to the Legislative Budget Board.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *