Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1750 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Darby (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 1750
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 19, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Transportation
 to lease and contract for the operation of rolling stock during
 certain emergencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 91.071(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Except for money received from the Texas economic
 development bank fund under Section 489.102, Government Code, and
 except as provided by Section 91.106(j), the  department may not
 spend money from the general revenue fund to implement this chapter
 except pursuant to a line-item appropriation.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter F, Chapter 91, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 91.106 to read as follows:
 Sec. 91.106.  OPERATIONS DURING CERTAIN EMERGENCIES.
 (a)  In this section, "director" means the executive director of
 the department.
 (b)  The director may issue an order authorizing the
 department to lease rolling stock and to contract with a qualified
 person or rail operator to operate rolling stock if:
 (1)  the director determines that a natural or man-made
 condition exists that threatens a department rail facility or the
 provision of safe and efficient rail services using a department
 rail facility; and
 (2)  the condition threatens health, life, or property
 in the affected area.
 (c)  An order issued under Subsection (b) takes effect
 according to the order's terms, but the order may not take effect
 until reasonable notice is given:
 (1)  in a newspaper of general circulation in the
 affected area;
 (2)  through television or radio serving the affected
 area; or
 (3)  by circulating notices or posting signs at
 conspicuous places in the affected area.
 (d)  An order issued under Subsection (b) must expire not
 later than the 30th day after the date the order is issued.
 (e)  The director may amend, modify, or rescind an order
 issued under Subsection (b) while the order is effective.
 (f)  The director may issue one or more successive orders as
 necessary to protect health, life, or property in the affected
 area. Each successive order must expire not later than the 30th day
 after the date the successive order is issued.
 (g)  The department may not use department employees to
 operate rolling stock.
 (h)  The department may enter into a contract authorized by
 an order issued under Subsection (b) for a period not to exceed 90
 days without using competitive bidding procedures otherwise
 required by law if the department attempts to negotiate with at
 least three qualified persons during the contracting process.
 (i)  Immediately after the department enters into a contract
 under this section, the department shall send a copy of the contract
 to the Legislative Budget Board.  On request of the Legislative
 Budget Board, the department may send the copy in an electronic
 format.
 (j)  The department may use any available funds to implement
 this section, including:
 (1)  the undedicated portion of the state highway fund;
 and
 (2)  any money appropriated to the department from the
 general revenue fund, regardless of whether there is a line-item
 appropriation for such a purpose.
 (k)  The department shall attempt to recover any state funds
 used by the department to implement this section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *