Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1753 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gallego, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1753
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 3, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 3, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the threshold amount at which public utilities are
 required to report a transaction.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 14.101(a), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Unless a public utility reports the transaction to the
 commission within a reasonable time, the public utility may not:
 (1)  sell, acquire, or lease a plant as an operating
 unit or system in this state for a total consideration of more than
 $10 million [$100,000]; or
 (2)  merge or consolidate with another public utility
 operating in this state.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an agreement for the sale, acquisition, or lease of a plant that
 is entered into on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 agreement for the sale, acquisition, or lease of a plant that is
 entered into before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law applicable to the agreement immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *