Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1781 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Price, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 1781
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Government Organization; May 18, 2011, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1781 By:  Hegar


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements
 applicable to state agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2052, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E.  OBSOLETE OR REDUNDANT REPORTING REQUIREMENTS
 Sec. 2052.401.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Executive director" means the executive head of a
 state agency. The term includes an executive director,
 commissioner, or executive commissioner as appropriate for the
 state agency.
 (2)  "State agency" means:
 (A)  a board, commission, department, office, or
 other agency in the executive branch of state government that was
 created by the constitution or a statute of the state, including an
 institution of higher education as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code;
 (B)  the legislature or a legislative agency; and
 (C)  the supreme court, the court of criminal
 appeals, a court of appeals, or a state judicial agency.
 Sec. 2052.402.  EXAMINATION OF REPORTING REQUIREMENTS. (a)
 Not later than August 1, 2012, the executive director of each state
 agency shall:
 (1)  examine the agency's reporting requirements
 established by a state statute enacted before January 1, 2009, and
 not amended since that date, and identify each reporting
 requirement that the executive director determines:
 (A)  is not necessary to accomplish the objectives
 of the statute that contains the reporting requirement;
 (B)  is redundant of other statutory reporting
 requirements; or
 (C)  is required under statute to be provided at a
 frequency for which data is not available; and
 (2)  provide to the governor, lieutenant governor,
 speaker of the house of representatives, chair of the House
 Committee on Government Efficiency and Reform, chair of the Senate
 Committee on Government Organization, chair of each standing
 committee of the senate and house of representatives with
 jurisdiction over the agency, Texas State Library and Archives
 Commission, and Legislative Budget Board an electronic report that
 includes:
 (A)  each statutory reporting requirement for
 which the executive director made a determination described by
 Subdivision (1); and
 (B)  the justification for the executive
 director's determination for each reporting requirement.
 (b)  The executive director may not include in the initial
 report issued under Subsection (a)(2) a reporting requirement that
 is required by federal law.
 Sec. 2052.403.  EXPIRATION.  This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2014.
 SECTION 2.  Section 325.011, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 325.011.  CRITERIA FOR REVIEW. The commission and its
 staff shall consider the following criteria in determining whether
 a public need exists for the continuation of a state agency or its
 advisory committees or for the performance of the functions of the
 agency or its advisory committees:
 (1)  the efficiency and effectiveness with which the
 agency or the advisory committee operates;
 (2)(A)  an identification of the mission, goals, and
 objectives intended for the agency or advisory committee and of the
 problem or need that the agency or advisory committee was intended
 to address; and
 (B)  the extent to which the mission, goals, and
 objectives have been achieved and the problem or need has been
 addressed;
 (3)(A)  an identification of any activities of the
 agency in addition to those granted by statute and of the authority
 for those activities; and
 (B)  the extent to which those activities are
 needed;
 (4)  an assessment of authority of the agency relating
 to fees, inspections, enforcement, and penalties;
 (5)  whether less restrictive or alternative methods of
 performing any function that the agency performs could adequately
 protect or provide service to the public;
 (6)  the extent to which the jurisdiction of the agency
 and the programs administered by the agency overlap or duplicate
 those of other agencies, the extent to which the agency coordinates
 with those agencies, and the extent to which the programs
 administered by the agency can be consolidated with the programs of
 other state agencies;
 (7)  the promptness and effectiveness with which the
 agency addresses complaints concerning entities or other persons
 affected by the agency, including an assessment of the agency's
 administrative hearings process;
 (8)  an assessment of the agency's rulemaking process
 and the extent to which the agency has encouraged participation by
 the public in making its rules and decisions and the extent to which
 the public participation has resulted in rules that benefit the
 public;
 (9)  the extent to which the agency has complied with:
 (A)  federal and state laws and applicable rules
 regarding equality of employment opportunity and the rights and
 privacy of individuals; and
 (B)  state law and applicable rules of any state
 agency regarding purchasing guidelines and programs for
 historically underutilized businesses;
 (10)  the extent to which the agency issues and
 enforces rules relating to potential conflicts of interest of its
 employees;
 (11)  the extent to which the agency complies with
 Chapters 551 and 552 and follows records management practices that
 enable the agency to respond efficiently to requests for public
 information; [and]
 (12)  the effect of federal intervention or loss of
 federal funds if the agency is abolished; and
 (13)  the extent to which the purpose and effectiveness
 of reporting requirements imposed on the agency justifies the
 continuation of the requirement.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (a), Section 325.012, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In its report on a state agency, the commission shall:
 (1)  make recommendations on the abolition,
 continuation, or reorganization of each affected state agency and
 its advisory committees and on the need for the performance of the
 functions of the agency and its advisory committees;
 (2)  make recommendations on the consolidation,
 transfer, or reorganization of programs within state agencies not
 under review when the programs duplicate functions performed in
 agencies under review; [and]
 (3)  make recommendations to improve the operations of
 the agency, its policy body, and its advisory committees, including
 management recommendations that do not require a change in the
 agency's enabling statute; and
 (4)  make recommendations on the continuation or
 abolition of each reporting requirement imposed on the agency by
 law.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September, 1, 2011.
 * * * * *