Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1781 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 16, 2011      TO: Honorable Bill Callegari, Chair, House Committee on Government Efficiency & Reform      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend Chapter 2052 of the Government Code to create a new examination of reporting requirements. Not later than August 1, 2012, the Executive Director of each state agency would be required to examine the agency's statutory reporting requirements and identify reports that are determined to be unnecessary, redundant, or required to be provided at a frequency for which data is not available. An electronic report would be created and provided to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and each member of the Senate and House of Representatives. Reports submitted may not include reporting requirements that are required by federal law or that also apply to another state agency.  This analysis assumes that the requirements of the bill could be accomplished with existing resources. The bill would take effect September 1, 2011 and would expire September 1, 2014. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:458 Alcoholic Beverage Commission, 477 Commission on State Emergency Communications, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 808 Historical Commission, 813 Commission on the Arts   LBB Staff:  JOB, KM, JI, PM    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 16, 2011





  TO: Honorable Bill Callegari, Chair, House Committee on Government Efficiency & Reform      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Bill Callegari, Chair, House Committee on Government Efficiency & Reform
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies.), As Introduced

 Honorable Bill Callegari, Chair, House Committee on Government Efficiency & Reform 

 Honorable Bill Callegari, Chair, House Committee on Government Efficiency & Reform 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies.), As Introduced

HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend Chapter 2052 of the Government Code to create a new examination of reporting requirements. Not later than August 1, 2012, the Executive Director of each state agency would be required to examine the agency's statutory reporting requirements and identify reports that are determined to be unnecessary, redundant, or required to be provided at a frequency for which data is not available. An electronic report would be created and provided to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and each member of the Senate and House of Representatives. Reports submitted may not include reporting requirements that are required by federal law or that also apply to another state agency.  This analysis assumes that the requirements of the bill could be accomplished with existing resources. The bill would take effect September 1, 2011 and would expire September 1, 2014.

The bill would amend Chapter 2052 of the Government Code to create a new examination of reporting requirements. Not later than August 1, 2012, the Executive Director of each state agency would be required to examine the agency's statutory reporting requirements and identify reports that are determined to be unnecessary, redundant, or required to be provided at a frequency for which data is not available. An electronic report would be created and provided to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and each member of the Senate and House of Representatives. Reports submitted may not include reporting requirements that are required by federal law or that also apply to another state agency. 

This analysis assumes that the requirements of the bill could be accomplished with existing resources. The bill would take effect September 1, 2011 and would expire September 1, 2014.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 458 Alcoholic Beverage Commission, 477 Commission on State Emergency Communications, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 808 Historical Commission, 813 Commission on the Arts

458 Alcoholic Beverage Commission, 477 Commission on State Emergency Communications, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 808 Historical Commission, 813 Commission on the Arts

LBB Staff: JOB, KM, JI, PM

 JOB, KM, JI, PM