Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1781 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    82R14295 YDB-D
 By: Price, Harper-Brown, Callegari, Frullo, H.B. No. 1781
 Thompson
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1781:
 By:  Harper-Brown C.S.H.B. No. 1781


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements
 applicable to state agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2052, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E.  OBSOLETE OR REDUNDANT REPORTING REQUIREMENTS
 Sec. 2052.401.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Executive director" means the executive head of a
 state agency. The term includes an executive director,
 commissioner, or executive commissioner as appropriate for the
 state agency.
 (2)  "State agency" means:
 (A)  a board, commission, department, office, or
 other agency in the executive branch of state government that was
 created by the constitution or a statute of the state, including an
 institution of higher education as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code;
 (B)  the legislature or a legislative agency; and
 (C)  the supreme court, the court of criminal
 appeals, a court of appeals, or a state judicial agency.
 Sec. 2052.402.  EXAMINATION OF REPORTING REQUIREMENTS. (a)
 Not later than August 1, 2012, the executive director of each state
 agency shall:
 (1)  examine the agency's reporting requirements
 established by a state statute enacted before January 1, 2009, and
 not amended since that date, and identify each reporting
 requirement that the executive director determines:
 (A)  is not necessary to accomplish the objectives
 of the statute that contains the reporting requirement;
 (B)  is redundant of other statutory reporting
 requirements; or
 (C)  is required under statute to be provided at a
 frequency for which data is not available; and
 (2)  provide to the governor, lieutenant governor,
 speaker of the house of representatives, chair of the House
 Committee on Government Efficiency and Reform, chair of the Senate
 Committee on Government Organization, Texas State Library and
 Archives Commission, and Legislative Budget Board an electronic
 report that includes:
 (A)  each statutory reporting requirement for
 which the executive director made a determination described by
 Subdivision (1); and
 (B)  the justification for the executive
 director's determination for each reporting requirement.
 (b)  The executive director may not include in the initial
 report issued under Subsection (a)(2) a reporting requirement that
 is required by federal law.
 Sec. 2052.403.  EXPIRATION.  This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2014.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.