Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1781 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 2, 2011      TO: Honorable Rodney Ellis, Chair, Senate Committee on Government Organization      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies.), As Engrossed    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend Chapter 2052 of the Government Code to create a new examination of statutory reporting requirements. Not later than August 1, 2012, the Executive Director of each state agency would be required to examine the agency's statutory reporting requirements and identify reports that are determined to be unnecessary, redundant, or required to be provided at a frequency for which data is not available. An electronic report would be created and provided to the Governor, LieutenantGovernor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, chair of the House Committee on Government Efficiency and Reform, chair of the Senate Committee on Government Organization, Texas State Library and Archives Commission, and Legislative Budget Board. Reports submitted may not include reporting requirements that are required by federal law. This analysis assumes that the requirements of the bill could be accomplished with existing resources.The bill would take effect September 1, 2011 and would expire September 1, 2014. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:   LBB Staff:  JOB, KM, JI, PM    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 2, 2011





  TO: Honorable Rodney Ellis, Chair, Senate Committee on Government Organization      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable Rodney Ellis, Chair, Senate Committee on Government Organization
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies.), As Engrossed

 Honorable Rodney Ellis, Chair, Senate Committee on Government Organization 

 Honorable Rodney Ellis, Chair, Senate Committee on Government Organization 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies.), As Engrossed

HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies.), As Engrossed



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend Chapter 2052 of the Government Code to create a new examination of statutory reporting requirements. Not later than August 1, 2012, the Executive Director of each state agency would be required to examine the agency's statutory reporting requirements and identify reports that are determined to be unnecessary, redundant, or required to be provided at a frequency for which data is not available. An electronic report would be created and provided to the Governor, LieutenantGovernor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, chair of the House Committee on Government Efficiency and Reform, chair of the Senate Committee on Government Organization, Texas State Library and Archives Commission, and Legislative Budget Board. Reports submitted may not include reporting requirements that are required by federal law. This analysis assumes that the requirements of the bill could be accomplished with existing resources.The bill would take effect September 1, 2011 and would expire September 1, 2014.

The bill would amend Chapter 2052 of the Government Code to create a new examination of statutory reporting requirements. Not later than August 1, 2012, the Executive Director of each state agency would be required to examine the agency's statutory reporting requirements and identify reports that are determined to be unnecessary, redundant, or required to be provided at a frequency for which data is not available. An electronic report would be created and provided to the Governor, LieutenantGovernor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, chair of the House Committee on Government Efficiency and Reform, chair of the Senate Committee on Government Organization, Texas State Library and Archives Commission, and Legislative Budget Board. Reports submitted may not include reporting requirements that are required by federal law.

This analysis assumes that the requirements of the bill could be accomplished with existing resources.The bill would take effect September 1, 2011 and would expire September 1, 2014.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies:



LBB Staff: JOB, KM, JI, PM

 JOB, KM, JI, PM