Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1781 Enrolled / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 25, 2011      TO: Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies. ), As Passed 2nd House    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend Chapter 2052 of the Government Code to create a new examination of statutory reporting requirements. Not later than August 1, 2012, the Executive Director of each state agency would be required to examine the agency's statutory reporting requirements and identify reports that are determined to be unnecessary, redundant, or required to be provided at a frequency for which data is not available. An electronic report would be created and provided to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, chair of the House Committee on Government Efficiency and Reform, chair of the Senate Committee on Government Organization, chair of each standing committee of the Senate and House of Representatives with jurisdiction over the agency, Texas State Library and Archives Commission, and Legislative Budget Board. Reports submitted may not include reporting requirements that are required by federal law. This section would expire September 1, 2014. The bill would require the Sunset Commission to review and make recommendations on agency reporting requirements as part of the Sunset review process. The bill eliminates several reports that are either completed by or submitted to the Office of the Attorney General and other state agencies. The bill would take effect September 1, 2011. This analysis assumes that the requirements of the bill could be accomplished with existing resources. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:301 Office of the Governor, 302 Office of the Attorney General, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 781 Higher Education Coordinating Board, 116 Sunset Advisory Commission   LBB Staff:  JOB, KM, JI, PM    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 25, 2011





  TO: Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies. ), As Passed 2nd House  

TO: Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies. ), As Passed 2nd House

 Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives 

 Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies. ), As Passed 2nd House

HB1781 by Price (Relating to obsolete or redundant reporting requirements applicable to state agencies. ), As Passed 2nd House



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend Chapter 2052 of the Government Code to create a new examination of statutory reporting requirements. Not later than August 1, 2012, the Executive Director of each state agency would be required to examine the agency's statutory reporting requirements and identify reports that are determined to be unnecessary, redundant, or required to be provided at a frequency for which data is not available. An electronic report would be created and provided to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, chair of the House Committee on Government Efficiency and Reform, chair of the Senate Committee on Government Organization, chair of each standing committee of the Senate and House of Representatives with jurisdiction over the agency, Texas State Library and Archives Commission, and Legislative Budget Board. Reports submitted may not include reporting requirements that are required by federal law. This section would expire September 1, 2014. The bill would require the Sunset Commission to review and make recommendations on agency reporting requirements as part of the Sunset review process. The bill eliminates several reports that are either completed by or submitted to the Office of the Attorney General and other state agencies. The bill would take effect September 1, 2011. This analysis assumes that the requirements of the bill could be accomplished with existing resources.

The bill would amend Chapter 2052 of the Government Code to create a new examination of statutory reporting requirements. Not later than August 1, 2012, the Executive Director of each state agency would be required to examine the agency's statutory reporting requirements and identify reports that are determined to be unnecessary, redundant, or required to be provided at a frequency for which data is not available. An electronic report would be created and provided to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, chair of the House Committee on Government Efficiency and Reform, chair of the Senate Committee on Government Organization, chair of each standing committee of the Senate and House of Representatives with jurisdiction over the agency, Texas State Library and Archives Commission, and Legislative Budget Board. Reports submitted may not include reporting requirements that are required by federal law. This section would expire September 1, 2014. The bill would require the Sunset Commission to review and make recommendations on agency reporting requirements as part of the Sunset review process.

The bill eliminates several reports that are either completed by or submitted to the Office of the Attorney General and other state agencies.

The bill would take effect September 1, 2011.

This analysis assumes that the requirements of the bill could be accomplished with existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 301 Office of the Governor, 302 Office of the Attorney General, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 781 Higher Education Coordinating Board, 116 Sunset Advisory Commission

301 Office of the Governor, 302 Office of the Attorney General, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 781 Higher Education Coordinating Board, 116 Sunset Advisory Commission

LBB Staff: JOB, KM, JI, PM

 JOB, KM, JI, PM