Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1784 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 1784
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2011;
 May 13, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 19, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 0; May 19, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring an interagency memorandum of understanding
 regarding the Public Assistance Reporting Information System and to
 the use of data from that system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0998 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0998.  MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING REGARDING
 PUBLIC ASSISTANCE REPORTING INFORMATION SYSTEM; MAXIMIZATION OF
 BENEFITS. (a)  In this section, "system" means the Public
 Assistance Reporting Information System (PARIS) operated by the
 Administration for Children and Families of the United States
 Department of Health and Human Services.
 (b)  The commission, the Texas Veterans Commission, the
 Veterans' Land Board, and the Department of Aging and Disability
 Services shall enter into a memorandum of understanding for the
 purposes of:
 (1)  coordinating and collecting information about the
 use and analysis among state agencies of data received from the
 system; and
 (2)  developing new strategies for state agencies to
 use system data in ways that:
 (A)  generate fiscal savings for the state; and
 (B)  maximize the availability of and access to
 benefits for veterans.
 (c)  The commission, the Texas Veterans Commission, and the
 Department of Aging and Disability Services shall coordinate to
 assist veterans in maximizing the benefits available to each
 veteran by using the system.
 (d)  The commission and the Texas Veterans Commission
 together may determine the geographic scope of the efforts
 described by Subsection (c).
 (e)  Not later than October 1, 2012, the commission, the
 Texas Veterans Commission, the Veterans' Land Board, and the
 Department of Aging and Disability Services collectively shall
 submit to the governor and the Legislative Budget Board a report
 describing:
 (1)  the frequency and success with which state
 agencies have used the system;
 (2)  the costs to the state that were avoided as a
 result of state agencies' use of the system; and
 (3)  recommendations for future use of the system by
 state agencies.
 (f)  Subsection (e) and this subsection expire September 1,
 2013.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2011, the Health and
 Human Services Commission, the Texas Veterans Commission, the
 Veterans' Land Board, and the Department of Aging and Disability
 Services shall enter into a memorandum of understanding as required
 by Section 531.0998, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *