By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 1784 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2011; May 13, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 3, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to requiring an interagency memorandum of understanding regarding the Public Assistance Reporting Information System and to the use of data from that system. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 531.0998 to read as follows: Sec. 531.0998. MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING REGARDING PUBLIC ASSISTANCE REPORTING INFORMATION SYSTEM; MAXIMIZATION OF BENEFITS. (a) In this section, "system" means the Public Assistance Reporting Information System (PARIS) operated by the Administration for Children and Families of the United States Department of Health and Human Services. (b) The commission, the Texas Veterans Commission, the Veterans' Land Board, and the Department of Aging and Disability Services shall enter into a memorandum of understanding for the purposes of: (1) coordinating and collecting information about the use and analysis among state agencies of data received from the system; and (2) developing new strategies for state agencies to use system data in ways that: (A) generate fiscal savings for the state; and (B) maximize the availability of and access to benefits for veterans. (c) The commission, the Texas Veterans Commission, and the Department of Aging and Disability Services shall coordinate to assist veterans in maximizing the benefits available to each veteran by using the system. (d) The commission and the Texas Veterans Commission together may determine the geographic scope of the efforts described by Subsection (c). (e) Not later than October 1, 2012, the commission, the Texas Veterans Commission, the Veterans' Land Board, and the Department of Aging and Disability Services collectively shall submit to the governor and the Legislative Budget Board a report describing: (1) the frequency and success with which state agencies have used the system; (2) the costs to the state that were avoided as a result of state agencies' use of the system; and (3) recommendations for future use of the system by state agencies. (f) Subsection (e) and this subsection expire September 1, 2013. SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2011, the Health and Human Services Commission, the Texas Veterans Commission, the Veterans' Land Board, and the Department of Aging and Disability Services shall enter into a memorandum of understanding as required by Section 531.0998, Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. * * * * *