Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1899 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Pickett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 1899
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 April 28, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 16, 2011, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 16, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1899 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the posting of signs in school crossing zones regarding
 the prohibited use of a wireless communication device while
 operating a motor vehicle.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 545.425, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (b-1) and (f) and adding Subsections (b-2),
 (b-3), (b-4), and (d-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Except as provided by Subsection (b-2), a [A]
 municipality, county, or other political subdivision that enforces
 this section shall post a sign that complies with the standards
 described by this subsection at the entrance to each school
 crossing zone in the municipality, county, or other political
 subdivision.  The department shall adopt standards that:
 (1)  allow for a sign required to be posted under this
 subsection to be attached to an existing sign at a minimal cost; and
 (2)  require that a sign required to be posted under
 this subsection inform an operator that:
 (A)  the use of a wireless communication device is
 prohibited in the school crossing zone; and
 (B)  the operator is subject to a fine if the
 operator uses a wireless communication device in the school
 crossing zone.
 (b-2)  A municipality, county, or other political
 subdivision that by ordinance or rule prohibits the use of a
 wireless communication device while operating a motor vehicle
 throughout the jurisdiction of the political subdivision is not
 required to post a sign as required by Subsection (b-1) if the
 political subdivision:
 (1)  posts signs that are located at each point at which
 a state highway, U.S. highway, or interstate highway enters the
 political subdivision and that state:
 (A)  that an operator is prohibited from using a
 wireless communication device while operating a motor vehicle in
 the political subdivision; and
 (B)  that the operator is subject to a fine if the
 operator uses a wireless communication device while operating a
 motor vehicle in the political subdivision; and
 (2)  subject to all applicable United States Department
 of Transportation Federal Highway Administration rules, posts a
 message that complies with Subdivision (1) on any dynamic message
 sign operated by the political subdivision located on a state
 highway, U.S. highway, or interstate highway in the political
 subdivision.
 (b-3)  A sign posted under Subsection (b-2)(1) must be
 readable to an operator traveling at the applicable speed limit.
 (b-4)  The political subdivision shall pay the costs
 associated with the posting of signs under Subsection (b-2).
 (d-1)  The affirmative defense available in Subsection
 (d)(2) is not available for an offense under Subsection (b)
 committed in a school crossing zone located in a municipality,
 county, or other political subdivision that is in compliance with
 Subsection (b-2).
 (f)  Except as provided by Subsection (b-2), this [This]
 section preempts all local ordinances, rules, or regulations that
 are inconsistent with specific provisions of this section adopted
 by a political subdivision of this state relating to the use of a
 wireless communication device by the operator of a motor vehicle.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *