Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1906 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Howard of Travis (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 1906
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 11, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the idling of motor vehicles; providing a criminal
 penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 7, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 7.1831 to read as follows:
 Sec. 7.1831.  VIOLATION OF LOCALLY ENFORCED MOTOR VEHICLE
 IDLING LIMITATIONS. (a)  A person commits an offense if the person
 violates a rule adopted by the commission concerning locally
 enforced motor vehicle idling limitations.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, an offense under this
 section is a Class C misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense is committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurs
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *