By: Madden (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 1908 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2011; April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; May 12, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to student loan repayment assistance for certain providers of correctional health care. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 61.532, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 61.532. ELIGIBILITY. [(a)] To be eligible to receive repayment assistance, a physician must: (1) apply to the coordinating board; (2) at the time of application, be licensed to practice medicine under Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code; (3) have completed one, two, three, or four consecutive years of practice in a health professional shortage area designated by the Department of State Health Services; and (4) provide health care services to: (A) recipients under the medical assistance program authorized by Chapter 32, Human Resources Code; [or] (B) enrollees under the child health plan program authorized by Chapter 62, Health and Safety Code; or (C) persons committed to a secure correctional facility operated by or under contract with the Texas Youth Commission or persons confined in a secure correctional facility operated by or under contract with any division of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice. SECTION 2. Section 61.533, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 61.533. LIMITATION. (a) A physician may receive repayment assistance grants for not more than four years. (b) Repayment assistance grants paid in relation to services described by Section 61.532(4)(C) are limited to the first 10 physicians who establish eligibility for those grants each year. SECTION 3. Subchapter E, Chapter 501, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 501.156 to read as follows: Sec. 501.156. STUDENT LOAN REPAYMENT ASSISTANCE. (a) From funds appropriated for purposes of correctional managed health care, the committee may provide student loan repayment assistance for medical and mental health care physicians and other staff providing correctional managed health care. The repayment assistance may be applied to any student loan received through any lender for education at a public or accredited private institution of higher education in the United States, including loans for undergraduate, graduate, and medical education. (b) The committee may adopt rules to implement this section, including rules governing eligibility for the loan repayment assistance and the terms of contracts between the committee and recipients of the loan repayment assistance. In adopting those rules, the committee shall consider the requirements of Subchapter J, Chapter 61, Education Code, and the rules of the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board adopted under that subchapter. (c) A physician may not receive loan repayment assistance under both this section and Subchapter J, Chapter 61, Education Code. (d) Not later than December 1 of each state fiscal year, the committee shall submit a report to the Legislative Budget Board and the governor on the use of funds under this section for the preceding fiscal year. SECTION 4. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall: (1) not later than December 1, 2011, adopt any rules necessary under Sections 61.532 and 61.533, Education Code, as amended by this Act; and (2) not later than January 1, 2012, begin providing as permitted by those sections student loan repayment assistance to providers of health care in secure correctional facilities. SECTION 5. The Correctional Managed Health Care Committee shall: (1) not later than December 1, 2011, adopt the rules for the provision of student loan repayment assistance under Section 501.156, Government Code, as added by this Act; and (2) not later than January 1, 2012, begin providing student loan repayment assistance under that section. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. * * * * *