Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1952 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 1952
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 3, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 3, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to alcoholic beverage seller-servers and to seller
 training programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 106.14, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  After notice and hearing, the commission may cancel or
 suspend the commission's approval of a seller training program, the
 commission's certification of a trainer to teach a seller training
 program, or the commission's certification of a seller-server if
 the program, trainer, or seller-server violates this code or a
 commission rule. The commission may give a program, trainer, or
 seller-server the opportunity to pay a civil penalty rather than be
 subject to suspension under this subsection. Sections 11.62
 through 11.67 apply to the program approval or certification as if
 the program approval or certification were a license or permit
 under this code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *