H.B. No. 1965 AN ACT relating to the expansion of faith- and community-based health and human services initiatives. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 535.051, Government Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: (b) The chief administrative officer of each of the following state agencies, in consultation with the governor, shall designate one employee from the agency to serve as a liaison for faith- and community-based organizations: (1) the Texas Department [Office] of Rural [Community] Affairs; (2) the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality; (3) the Texas Department of Criminal Justice; (4) the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs; (5) the Texas Education Agency; (6) the Texas Juvenile Probation Commission; (7) the Texas Veterans Commission; (8) the Texas Workforce Commission; (9) the Texas Youth Commission; (10) the office of the governor; (11) the Department of Public Safety; (12) the Texas Department of Insurance; (13) the Public Utility Commission of Texas; (14) the office of the attorney general; (15) the Department of Agriculture; (16) the office of the comptroller; (17) the Department of Information Resources; (18) the Office of State-Federal Relations; (19) the office of the secretary of state; and (20) [(10)] other state agencies as determined by the governor. (c) The commissioner of higher education, in consultation with the presiding officer of the interagency coordinating group, shall designate one employee from an institution of higher education, as that term is defined under Section 61.003, Education Code, to serve as a liaison for faith- and community-based organizations. SECTION 2. Sections 535.053(a) and (b), Government Code, are amended to read as follows: (a) The interagency coordinating group for faith- and community-based initiatives is composed of each faith- and community-based liaison designated under Section 535.051 and a liaison from the State Commission on National and Community Service. The commission shall provide administrative support to the interagency coordinating group. (b) The liaison from the State Commission on National and Community Service [commission employee designated as a liaison under Section 535.051] is the presiding officer of the interagency coordinating group. If the State Commission on National and Community Service is abolished, the liaison from the governor's office is the presiding officer of the interagency coordinating group. SECTION 3. Section 535.054, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 535.054. REPORT [REPORTS]. (a) Not later than December 1 of each year, the interagency coordinating group shall submit a report to the legislature that describes in detail the activities, goals, and progress of the interagency coordinating group. [A liaison designated under Section 535.051 shall: [(1) provide periodic reports to the executive commissioner or other chief executive officer who designated the liaison, as applicable, on a schedule determined by the person who designated the liaison; and [(2) report annually to the governor's office of faith- and community-based initiatives and as necessary to the State Commission on National and Community Service regarding the liaison's efforts to comply with the duties imposed under Sections 535.052 and 535.053.] (b) The [Each] report made under Subsection (a) [(a)(2)] must be made available to the public through posting on the office of the governor's Internet website[, and the reports may be aggregated into a single report for that purpose]. SECTION 4. Subchapter B, Chapter 535, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 535.055 to read as follows: Sec. 535.055. TASK FORCE ON IMPROVING RELATIONS WITH NONPROFITS. (a) The interagency coordinating group task force is established to help direct the interagency coordinating group in carrying out the group's duties under this section. The commission shall provide administrative support to the task force. (b) The executive commissioner, in consultation with the presiding officer of the interagency coordinating group, shall appoint as members of the task force one representative from each of the following groups and entities: (1) a statewide nonprofit organization; (2) local governments; (3) faith-based groups; (4) community-based groups; (5) consultants to nonprofit corporations; (6) experts in grant writing; and (7) a statewide association of nonprofit organizations. (c) In addition to the interagency coordinating group's other duties, the interagency coordinating group, in coordination with the task force, shall: (1) develop and implement a plan for improving contracting relationships between state agencies and faith- and community-based organizations; (2) develop best practices for cooperating and collaborating with faith- and community-based organizations; (3) identify and address duplication of services provided by the state and faith- and community-based organizations; and (4) identify and address gaps in state services that faith- and community-based organizations could fill. (d) The task force shall prepare a report describing actions taken or not taken by the interagency coordinating group under this section and include in the report any recommendations relating to legislation necessary to address an issue identified by the group under this section. The task force shall present the report to the House Committee on Human Services or its successor, the House Committee on Public Health or its successor, and the Senate Health and Human Services Committee or its successor not later than September 1, 2012. (e) This section expires September 1, 2013. SECTION 5. Not later than October 1, 2011, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall appoint members to the interagency coordinating group task force in accordance with Section 535.055, Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1965 was passed by the House on April 19, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1965 was passed by the Senate on May 19, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0 . ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor