Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1975 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 4, 2011      TO: Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, House Committee on Elections      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1975 by King, Phil (Relating to the submission of election changes under Section 5 of the Voting Rights Act of 1965.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1975, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($612,217) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 4, 2011





  TO: Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, House Committee on Elections      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1975 by King, Phil (Relating to the submission of election changes under Section 5 of the Voting Rights Act of 1965.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, House Committee on Elections
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1975 by King, Phil (Relating to the submission of election changes under Section 5 of the Voting Rights Act of 1965.), As Introduced

 Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, House Committee on Elections 

 Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, House Committee on Elections 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1975 by King, Phil (Relating to the submission of election changes under Section 5 of the Voting Rights Act of 1965.), As Introduced

HB1975 by King, Phil (Relating to the submission of election changes under Section 5 of the Voting Rights Act of 1965.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1975, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($612,217) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1975, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($612,217) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2012 ($475,727)   2013 ($136,490)   2014 $0   2015 $0   2016 $0    


2012 ($475,727)
2013 ($136,490)
2014 $0
2015 $0
2016 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2012 ($475,727)   2013 ($136,490)   2014 $0   2015 $0   2016 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2012 ($475,727)   2013 ($136,490)   2014 $0   2015 $0   2016 $0  


2012 ($475,727)
2013 ($136,490)
2014 $0
2015 $0
2016 $0

Fiscal Analysis

 The bill would require the Secretary of State (SOS), the Office of Attorney General (OAG), or other state officer to submit changes in the election process or procedure enacted by the Eighty-second Legislature, Regular Session, 2011 that is required to be submitted to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia to determine whether the change has the purpose or effect of denying or abridging the right to vote on account of race or color or in contravention of the guarantees set forth in 42 U.S.C. Section 1973b(f)(2).  This section would expire September 1, 2013.  This bill would take effect if it receives a vote of two-thirds or on September 1, 2011.

The bill would require the Secretary of State (SOS), the Office of Attorney General (OAG), or other state officer to submit changes in the election process or procedure enacted by the Eighty-second Legislature, Regular Session, 2011 that is required to be submitted to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia to determine whether the change has the purpose or effect of denying or abridging the right to vote on account of race or color or in contravention of the guarantees set forth in 42 U.S.C. Section 1973b(f)(2).  This section would expire September 1, 2013.  This bill would take effect if it receives a vote of two-thirds or on September 1, 2011.

Methodology

There is an average of 150 election-related enactments each session.  It is assumed that the Secretary of State (SOS) and the Office of Attorney General (OAG) would need to work together to file litigation to seek preclearance from the United States District Court for the District of Columbia for each change in the election process or procedure enacted by the Eighty-second Legislature, Regular Session, 2011.   It is assumed that SOS would need funding for two legal assistants and OAG would need funding for four attorneys in fiscal year 2012 to file litigation on approximately 150 election-related enactments.  It is also assumed that SOS would need funding for one legal assistant and OAG would need funding for one attorney in fiscal year 2013 to respond to litigation that is contested.

There is an average of 150 election-related enactments each session.  It is assumed that the Secretary of State (SOS) and the Office of Attorney General (OAG) would need to work together to file litigation to seek preclearance from the United States District Court for the District of Columbia for each change in the election process or procedure enacted by the Eighty-second Legislature, Regular Session, 2011.

 

It is assumed that SOS would need funding for two legal assistants and OAG would need funding for four attorneys in fiscal year 2012 to file litigation on approximately 150 election-related enactments.  It is also assumed that SOS would need funding for one legal assistant and OAG would need funding for one attorney in fiscal year 2013 to respond to litigation that is contested.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 302 Office of the Attorney General, 307 Secretary of State

302 Office of the Attorney General, 307 Secretary of State

LBB Staff: JOB, JT, MS, BTA

 JOB, JT, MS, BTA