Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1981 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Smith of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Gallegos) H.B. No. 1981
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources; May 16, 2011, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 16, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1981 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to measuring, monitoring, and reporting emissions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 382, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 382.0161 to read as follows:
 Sec. 382.0161.  AIR POLLUTANT WATCH LIST. (a) The
 commission shall establish and maintain an air pollutant watch
 list. The air pollutant watch list must identify:
 (1)  each air contaminant that the commission
 determines, on the basis of federal or state ambient air quality
 standards for the contaminant, should be included on the air
 pollutant watch list; and
 (2)  each geographic area of the state for which
 ambient air quality monitoring data indicates that the individual
 or cumulative emissions of one or more air contaminants identified
 by the commission under Subdivision (1) may cause short-term or
 long-term adverse human health effects or odors in that area.
 (b)  The commission shall publish notice of and allow public
 comment on:
 (1)  an addition of an air contaminant to or removal of
 an air contaminant from the air pollutant watch list; or
 (2)  an addition of an area to or removal of an area
 from the air pollutant watch list.
 (c)  When considering the addition or removal of an area to
 or from the air pollutant watch list, the commission shall provide
 the monitoring data related to the area to the state senator and
 representative who represent the area.
 (d)  The commission may hold a public meeting in an area
 listed on the air pollutant watch list to provide residents of the
 area with information regarding:
 (1)  the reasons for the area's inclusion on the air
 pollutant watch list; and
 (2)  commission actions to reduce the emissions of air
 contaminants contributing to the area's inclusion on the air
 pollutant watch list.
 (e)  The air pollutant watch list and the addition or removal
 of a pollutant or area to or from the list are not matters subject to
 the requirements of Subchapter B, Chapter 2001, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 382.0215(e) and (g), Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (e)  The commission shall develop the capacity for
 electronic reporting and shall incorporate reported emissions
 events into a permanent online centralized database for emissions
 events. The commission shall develop a mechanism whereby the
 reporting entity shall be allowed to review the information
 relative to its reported emissions events prior to such information
 being included in the database. The database shall be easily
 searchable and accessible to the public. The commission shall
 evaluate information in the database to identify persons who
 repeatedly fail to report reportable emissions events. The
 commission shall enforce against such persons pursuant to Section
 382.0216(i). The commission shall describe such enforcement
 actions in the report required in Subsection (g).
 (g)  The commission annually, or at the request of a member
 of the legislature, shall assess the information received under
 this section, including actions taken by the commission in response
 to the emissions events, and shall include the assessment in the
 report required by Section 5.126, Water Code.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 505, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 505.017 to read as follows:
 Sec. 505.017.  NOTICE ISSUED UNDER EMERGENCIES. (a) When
 immediate notification of a release by a facility to the state
 emergency response commission is required in accordance with EPCRA,
 the state agency responsible for the information submitted to the
 state emergency response commission, on receipt of the required
 notification, shall make a determination as to whether the release
 reported will substantially endanger human health or the
 environment.
 (b)  If the responsible state agency determines that a
 release will substantially endanger human health or the
 environment, the agency shall, on request, notify the state senator
 or representative who represents the area in which the facility is
 located of the release within four hours of receipt of the original
 notification.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *