H.B. No. 1992 AN ACT relating to the authority of the Texas Animal Health Commission to set and collect fees. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 161.060, Agriculture Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 161.060. AUTHORITY TO SET AND COLLECT [INSPECTION] FEES. (a) The commission may charge a fee, as provided by commission rule, for an inspection made by the commission. (b) The commission by rule may set and collect a fee for any service provided by the commission, including: (1) the inspection of animals or facilities; (2) the testing of animals for disease; (3) obtaining samples from animals for disease testing; (4) disease prevention, control or eradication, and treatment efforts; (5) services related to the transport of livestock; (6) control and eradication of ticks and other pests; and (7) any other service for which the commission incurs a cost. (c) This subsection and Subsection (b) expire September 1, 2015. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1992 was passed by the House on May 4, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 98, Nays 40, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 1992 on May 23, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 106, Nays 36, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1992 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 20, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0 . ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor