Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1992 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hardcastle, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 1992
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture and Rural Affairs; May 18, 2011, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1992 By:  Hegar


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Animal Health Commission to
 set and collect fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 161.060, Agriculture Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 161.060.  AUTHORITY TO SET AND COLLECT [INSPECTION]
 FEES.  (a)  The commission may charge a fee, as provided by
 commission rule, for an inspection made by the commission.
 (b)  The commission by rule may set and collect a fee for any
 service provided by the commission, including:
 (1)  the inspection of animals or facilities;
 (2)  the testing of animals for disease;
 (3)  obtaining samples from animals for disease
 testing;
 (4)  disease prevention, control or eradication, and
 treatment efforts;
 (5)  services related to the transport of livestock;
 (6)  control and eradication of ticks and other pests;
 and
 (7)  any other service for which the commission incurs
 a cost.
 (c)  This subsection and Subsection (b) expire September 1,
 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *