H.B. No. 200 AN ACT relating to the notification of the release of certain inmates given to certain courts, law enforcement agencies, and the United States Social Security Administration. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 493.025, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 493.025. NOTIFICATION OF COURT OF RELEASE. On release of an inmate who discharges the inmate's sentence or on release of an inmate on parole or to mandatory supervision, the department promptly shall notify the clerk of the court in which the inmate was convicted of that fact. The notice must be provided by e-mail or other electronic communication. SECTION 2. Chapter 493, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 493.030 to read as follows: Sec. 493.030. NOTICE TO SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (a) The department shall notify the United States Social Security Administration of the release or discharge of a prisoner who: (1) immediately before the prisoner's confinement in a state correctional facility, was receiving: (A) Supplemental Security Income (SSI) benefits under 42 U.S.C. Section 1381 et seq.; or (B) Social Security Disability Insurance (SSDI) benefits under 42 U.S.C. Section 401 et seq.; and (2) before the release or discharge, was confined in the facility for a period of less than 12 consecutive months. (b) The department shall provide the notice described by Subsection (a) to the United States Social Security Administration by mail and electronically immediately on the prisoner's release or discharge from custody. The department shall provide a copy of the notice to the prisoner at the time of the prisoner's release or discharge. SECTION 3. Section 499.026(d), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (d) Not later than the 10th day before the date on which a parole panel proposes to release an inmate under this subchapter, the department shall give notice of the proposed release to the sheriff, the attorney representing the state, and the district judge of the county in which the defendant was convicted. If there was a change of venue in the case, the department shall also notify the sheriff, the attorney representing the state, and the district judge of the county in which the prosecution was originated. Any notice required by this subsection must be provided by e-mail or other electronic communication. SECTION 4. Section 499.051(a), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) On the release of an inmate determined by the department to be a member of a security threat group, the department shall notify the sheriff of the county to which the inmate is released and, if the inmate is released to a municipality, the chief of police for that municipality. The notice must state the date on which the inmate was released and state that the inmate has been determined by the department to be a member of a security threat group. The notice must be provided by e-mail or other electronic communication. SECTION 5. Section 508.115, Government Code, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: (e) The notice must be provided by e-mail or other electronic communication. SECTION 6. Section 508.181(g), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (g) The division shall, on the first working day of each month, notify the sheriff of any county in which the total number of sex offenders under the supervision and control of the division residing in the county exceeds 10 percent of the total number of sex offenders in the state under the supervision and control of the division. The notice must be provided by e-mail or other electronic communication. If the total number of sex offenders under the supervision and control of the division residing in a county exceeds 22 percent of the total number of sex offenders in the state under the supervision and control of the division, a parole panel may require a sex offender to reside in that county only as required by Subsection (a) or for the reason stated in Subsection (b)(2)(B). In this subsection, "sex offender" means a person who is released on parole or to mandatory supervision after serving a sentence for an offense described by Section 508.187(a). SECTION 7. Section 493.030, Government Code, as added by this Act, applies to the release or discharge of a prisoner from a state correctional facility that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act, regardless of the date the prisoner was initially confined in the state correctional facility. SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 200 was passed by the House on March 30, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 200 on May 21, 2011, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 200 on May 28, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 200 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 19, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 200 on May 28, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0 . ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor