H.B. No. 2089 AN ACT relating to the resolution of overpayment or underpayment of income benefits under the workers' compensation program. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 408.081(a), Labor Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) An employee is entitled to timely and accurate income benefits as provided in this chapter. SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 408, Labor Code, is amended by adding Section 408.0815 to read as follows: Sec. 408.0815. RESOLUTION OF OVERPAYMENT OR UNDERPAYMENT OF INCOME BENEFITS. (a) The commissioner by rule shall establish a procedure by which an insurance carrier: (1) may recoup an overpayment of income benefits from future income benefit payments that are not reimbursable under Section 410.209; and (2) shall pay an underpayment of income benefits, including interest on accrued but unpaid benefits, in accordance with this subtitle. (b) The procedure under Subsection (a) must include: (1) a process by which an injured employee may notify the insurance carrier of an underpayment; (2) the time frame and methodology by which an insurance carrier shall pay to an injured employee an underpayment; (3) a process by which an insurance carrier shall notify an injured employee of an overpayment of income benefits; (4) the time frame and methodology by which an insurance carrier may recoup an overpayment through the reduction of a future income benefit payment; and (5) a method for coordinating overpayments that may be recouped from future income benefits and reimbursements described by Section 410.209. (c) The procedure for recouping overpayments under Subsection (a)(1) must take into consideration the cause of the overpayment and minimize the financial hardship to the injured employee. SECTION 3. The commissioner of workers' compensation shall adopt rules to implement Section 408.0815, Labor Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1, 2012. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2089 was passed by the House on May 13, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2089 on May 27, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2089 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor