H.B. No. 2102 AN ACT relating to the requirement that certain mammography reports contain information regarding supplemental breast cancer screening. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as Henda's Law. SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 86, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 86.013 to read as follows: Sec. 86.013. INFORMATION ON SUPPLEMENTAL BREAST CANCER SCREENING. (a) On completion of a mammogram, a mammography facility certified by the United States Food and Drug Administration or by a certification agency approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration shall provide to the patient the following notice: "If your mammogram demonstrates that you have dense breast tissue, which could hide abnormalities, and you have other risk factors for breast cancer that have been identified, you might benefit from supplemental screening tests that may be suggested by your ordering physician. "Dense breast tissue, in and of itself, is a relatively common condition. Therefore, this information is not provided to cause undue concern, but rather to raise your awareness and to promote discussion with your physician regarding the presence of other risk factors, in addition to dense breast tissue. "A report of your mammography results will be sent to you and your physician. You should contact your physician if you have any questions or concerns regarding this report." (b) Notwithstanding any other law, this section does not create a cause of action or create a standard of care, obligation, or duty that provides a basis for a cause of action. (c) The information required by this section or evidence that a person violated this section is not admissible in a civil, judicial, or administrative proceeding. SECTION 3. A mammography facility is not required to comply with the requirements of Section 86.013, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, until January 1, 2012. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2102 was passed by the House on May 11, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 130, Nays 19, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2102 on May 27, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 5, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2102 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor