Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2102 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hernandez Luna, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 2102
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2011;
 May 12, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 20, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2102 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that certain mammography reports
 contain information regarding supplemental breast cancer
 screening.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as Henda's Law.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 86, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 86.013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 86.013.  INFORMATION ON SUPPLEMENTAL BREAST CANCER
 SCREENING. (a)  On completion of a mammogram, a mammography
 facility certified by the United States Food and Drug
 Administration or by a certification agency approved by the United
 States Food and Drug Administration shall provide to the patient
 the following notice:
 "If your mammogram demonstrates that you have dense breast
 tissue, which could hide abnormalities, and you have other risk
 factors for breast cancer that have been identified, you might
 benefit from supplemental screening tests that may be suggested by
 your ordering physician.
 "Dense breast tissue, in and of itself, is a relatively
 common condition. Therefore, this information is not provided to
 cause undue concern, but rather to raise your awareness and to
 promote discussion with your physician regarding the presence of
 other risk factors, in addition to dense breast tissue.
 "A report of your mammography results will be sent to you and
 your physician.  You should contact your physician if you have any
 questions or concerns regarding this report."
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, this section does not
 create a cause of action or create a standard of care, obligation,
 or duty that provides a basis for a cause of action.
 (c)  The information required by this section or evidence
 that a person violated this section is not admissible in a civil,
 judicial, or administrative proceeding.
 SECTION 3.  A mammography facility is not required to comply
 with the requirements of Section 86.013, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, until January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *