Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2127 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 2127
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture and Rural Affairs; May 17, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the municipal regulation of the discharge of firearms
 and certain other weapons in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 229, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 229.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 229.004.  REGULATION OF DISCHARGE OF WEAPON BY CERTAIN
 MUNICIPALITIES. (a)  This section applies only to a municipality
 located in a county in which the majority of the population of two
 or more municipalities with a population of 300,000 or more are
 located.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 229.002, a municipality may not
 apply a regulation relating to the discharge of firearms or other
 weapons in the extraterritorial jurisdiction of the municipality or
 in an area annexed by the municipality on or before September 1,
 1981, if the firearm or other weapon is:
 (1)  a shotgun, air rifle or pistol, BB gun, or bow and
 arrow discharged:
 (A)  on a tract of land of 100 acres or more and
 more than 150 feet from a residence or occupied building located on
 another property; and
 (B)  in a manner not reasonably expected to cause
 a projectile to cross the boundary of the tract; or
 (2)  a center fire or rim fire rifle or pistol of any
 caliber discharged:
 (A)  on a tract of land of 100 acres or more and
 more than 300 feet from a residence or occupied building located on
 another property; and
 (B)  in a manner not reasonably expected to cause
 a projectile to cross the boundary of the tract.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *