Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2135 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hochberg, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 2135
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 19, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2135 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of end-of-course and other
 assessment instruments to certain public school students enrolled
 below the high school level.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.021(c), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  In determining promotion under Subsection (a), a school
 district shall consider:
 (1)  the recommendation of the student's teacher;
 (2)  the student's grade in each subject or course;
 (3)  the student's score on an assessment instrument
 administered under Section 39.023(a), (b), or (l), to the extent
 applicable; and
 (4)  any other necessary academic information, as
 determined by the district.
 SECTION 2.  Section 28.0211, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (o) and (p) to read as follows:
 (o)  This section does not require the administration of a
 fifth or eighth grade assessment instrument in a subject under
 Section 39.023(a) to a student enrolled in the fifth or eighth
 grade, as applicable, if the student:
 (1)  is enrolled in a course in the subject intended for
 students above the student's grade level and will be administered
 an assessment instrument adopted or developed under Section
 39.023(a) that aligns with the curriculum for the course in which
 the student is enrolled; or
 (2)  is enrolled in a course in the subject for which
 the student will receive high school academic credit and will be
 administered an end-of-course assessment instrument adopted under
 Section 39.023(c) for the course.
 (p)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section, a
 student described by Subsection (o) may not be denied promotion on
 the basis of failure to perform satisfactorily on an assessment
 instrument not required to be administered to the student in
 accordance with that subsection.
 SECTION 3.  Section 39.023, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-2) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The agency shall adopt or develop appropriate
 criterion-referenced assessment instruments designed to assess
 essential knowledge and skills in reading, writing, mathematics,
 social studies, and science. Except as provided by Subsection
 (a-2), all [All] students, other than [except] students assessed
 under Subsection (b) or (l) or exempted under Section 39.027, shall
 be assessed in:
 (1)  mathematics, annually in grades three through
 seven without the aid of technology and in grade eight with the aid
 of technology on any assessment instrument that includes algebra;
 (2)  reading, annually in grades three through eight;
 (3)  writing, including spelling and grammar, in grades
 four and seven;
 (4)  social studies, in grade eight;
 (5)  science, in grades five and eight; and
 (6)  any other subject and grade required by federal
 law.
 (a-2)  A student is not required to be assessed in a subject
 otherwise assessed at the student's grade level under Subsection
 (a) if the student:
 (1)  is enrolled in a course in the subject intended for
 students above the student's grade level and will be administered
 an assessment instrument adopted or developed under Subsection (a)
 that aligns with the curriculum for the course in which the student
 is enrolled; or
 (2)  is enrolled in a course in the subject for which
 the student will receive high school academic credit and will be
 administered an end-of-course assessment instrument adopted under
 Subsection (c) for the course.
 SECTION 4.  Section 39.025, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e-1) to read as follows:
 (e-1)  Nothing in this section has the effect of prohibiting
 the administration of an end-of-course assessment instrument
 listed in Section 39.023(c) to a student enrolled below the high
 school level who is enrolled in the course for which the assessment
 instrument is adopted. The commissioner shall adopt rules
 necessary to ensure that the student's performance on the
 assessment instrument is considered in the same manner for purposes
 of this section as the performance of a student enrolled at the high
 school level.
 SECTION 5.  Section 39.053, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  In aggregating results of assessment instruments
 across grade levels by subject in accordance with Subsection
 (c)(1), the performance of a student enrolled below the high school
 level on an assessment instrument required under Section 39.023(c)
 is included with results relating to other students enrolled at the
 same grade level.
 SECTION 6.  Section 39.203, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  In addition to the distinction designations otherwise
 described by this section, the commissioner may award a distinction
 designation to a campus with a significant number of students below
 grade nine who perform satisfactorily on an end-of-course
 assessment instrument administered under Section 39.023(c).
 SECTION 7.  This Act applies beginning with the 2011-2012
 school year.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *