Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2144 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    82R19660 DRH-D
 By: Garza H.B. No. 2144
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2144:
 By:  Branch C.S.H.B. No. 2144


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of uniform election dates by newly incorporated
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.001(b), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not apply to:
 (1)  a runoff election;
 (2)  an election to resolve a tie vote;
 (3)  an election held under an order of a court or other
 tribunal;
 (4)  an emergency election ordered under Section
 41.0011;
 (5)  an expedited election to fill a vacancy in the
 legislature held under Section 203.013; [or]
 (6)  an election held under a statute that expressly
 provides that the requirement of Subsection (a) does not apply to
 the election; or
 (7)  the initial election of the members of the
 governing body of a newly incorporated city.
 SECTION 2.  Section 41.0052, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  The governing body of a newly incorporated city may, not
 later than the second anniversary of the date of incorporation,
 change the date on which it holds its general election for officers
 to another authorized uniform election date.
 (d)  Not later than September 1, 2012, the governing body of
 a city that was newly incorporated between January 1, 2007, and
 September 1, 2011, may change the date on which it holds its general
 election for officers to another authorized uniform election date.
 This subsection expires September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 21, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 21.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.005.  CHOICE OF UNIFORM ELECTION DATE FOR NEWLY
 INCORPORATED MUNICIPALITY. Not later than the first anniversary of
 the date of its incorporation, a newly incorporated municipality
 shall select a uniform election date under Section 41.001, Election
 Code, to use for the general election of the members of the
 municipality's governing body.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.