Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2144 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 12, 2011      TO: Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, House Committee on Elections      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2144 by Garza (relating to the use of uniform election dates by newly incorporated municipalities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Election Code to authorize a newly incorporated city to hold the initial election for the members of the governing body on a date other than the uniform election date. The governing body of a newly incorporated city could change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to another authorized uniform election date, not later than the second anniversary of the date of incorporation. The governing body of a city that was newly incorporated between January 1, 2007 and September 1, 2011 could change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to another authorized uniform election date, no later than September 2, 2012. The bill would amend the Local Government Code to require a newly incorporated municipality to select a uniform election date for the general election of members of the municipalitys governing body no later than the first anniversary of incorporation. Local Government Impact There would be a fiscal impact to local governments associated with an election; however, those costs would vary by locality and are not anticipated to be significant. Based on costs reported to the Secretary of State (SOS) in 2010 by a sampling of counties, municipalities, and special districts, the average cost incurred by a local governmental entity for an election is $1.98 per registered voter. Bexar County reported the provisions of the bill would not have a significant fiscal impact on the county.    Source Agencies:   LBB Staff:  JOB, JT, JB    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 12, 2011





  TO: Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, House Committee on Elections      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2144 by Garza (relating to the use of uniform election dates by newly incorporated municipalities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, House Committee on Elections
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2144 by Garza (relating to the use of uniform election dates by newly incorporated municipalities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, House Committee on Elections 

 Honorable Larry Taylor, Chair, House Committee on Elections 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2144 by Garza (relating to the use of uniform election dates by newly incorporated municipalities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB2144 by Garza (relating to the use of uniform election dates by newly incorporated municipalities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Election Code to authorize a newly incorporated city to hold the initial election for the members of the governing body on a date other than the uniform election date. The governing body of a newly incorporated city could change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to another authorized uniform election date, not later than the second anniversary of the date of incorporation. The governing body of a city that was newly incorporated between January 1, 2007 and September 1, 2011 could change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to another authorized uniform election date, no later than September 2, 2012. The bill would amend the Local Government Code to require a newly incorporated municipality to select a uniform election date for the general election of members of the municipalitys governing body no later than the first anniversary of incorporation.

The bill would amend the Election Code to authorize a newly incorporated city to hold the initial election for the members of the governing body on a date other than the uniform election date. The governing body of a newly incorporated city could change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to another authorized uniform election date, not later than the second anniversary of the date of incorporation. The governing body of a city that was newly incorporated between January 1, 2007 and September 1, 2011 could change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to another authorized uniform election date, no later than September 2, 2012.

The bill would amend the Local Government Code to require a newly incorporated municipality to select a uniform election date for the general election of members of the municipalitys governing body no later than the first anniversary of incorporation.

Local Government Impact

There would be a fiscal impact to local governments associated with an election; however, those costs would vary by locality and are not anticipated to be significant. Based on costs reported to the Secretary of State (SOS) in 2010 by a sampling of counties, municipalities, and special districts, the average cost incurred by a local governmental entity for an election is $1.98 per registered voter. Bexar County reported the provisions of the bill would not have a significant fiscal impact on the county.

There would be a fiscal impact to local governments associated with an election; however, those costs would vary by locality and are not anticipated to be significant. Based on costs reported to the Secretary of State (SOS) in 2010 by a sampling of counties, municipalities, and special districts, the average cost incurred by a local governmental entity for an election is $1.98 per registered voter.

Bexar County reported the provisions of the bill would not have a significant fiscal impact on the county.

Source Agencies:



LBB Staff: JOB, JT, JB

 JOB, JT, JB