Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2154 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eiland (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 2154
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 7, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 10, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 10, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2154 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain continuing education requirements for agents
 who sell annuities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4004.202(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Each agent described by Subsection (a) must complete
 eight [four] hours of continuing education [annually] that
 specifically relates to annuities during the agent's two-year
 licensing period.  [The annual period under this section must be
 based on the agent's license expiration date or another date
 specified by the commissioner by rule, and the education
 requirement under this subsection must be met within that annual
 period, notwithstanding Section 4004.051(b).]
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *