Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2367 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2367


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of an advisory panel to study certain
 parental rights relating to possession of or access to the parent's
 child.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  PARENTAL RIGHTS ADVISORY PANEL. (a) The
 Parental Rights Advisory Panel is established to study and provide
 recommendations to the legislature regarding a parent's right to
 possession of or access to the parent's child, including
 interference with that right by the other parent, when:
 (1)  no court order for possession of or access to a
 child is in effect or pending; and
 (2)  the party allegedly interfering with the rights of
 a parent is not aware of any plans by the parent to seek an order for
 possession of or access to a child.
 (b)  The panel shall specifically address the desirability
 of potential Texas legislation:
 (1)  clarifying a parent's rights to possession of or
 access to the parent's child in the absence of a current or pending
 court order for possession of or access to the child;
 (2)  creating the offense of depriving a parent of
 possession of or access to the parent's child in the absence of a
 current or pending court order for possession of or access to the
 child;
 (3)  implementing measures that allow for the
 establishment of orders of possession of or access to a child while
 protecting the rights and safety of victims of family violence and
 the families of the victims;
 (4)  requiring schools to notify the other parent if
 one parent unenrolls a child from the child's school; and
 (5)  relating to any other matter regarding possession
 of or access to a child in the absence of a current or pending court
 order relating to the possession of or access to the child.
 (c)  The advisory panel consists of nine members appointed by
 the governor.
 (d)  When making initial appointments under Subsection (c),
 the governor shall designate one of the appointees as presiding
 officer of the advisory panel.
 (e)  The advisory panel shall meet not later than the 30th
 day after the date the initial appointments are made under
 Subsection (c) and shall meet regularly as necessary at the call of
 the presiding officer.
 (f)  An advisory panel member is not entitled to
 reimbursement of expenses or to compensation.
 (g)  The governor shall appoint members to the panel not
 later than December 31, 2011.
 (h)  Not later than December 31, 2012, the advisory panel
 shall submit to the legislature a report outlining the results of
 its studies made under this section and its recommendations for
 legislation.
 SECTION 2.  INAPPLICABILITY OF CERTAIN LAW. Chapter 2110,
 Government Code, does not apply to the advisory panel established
 under this Act.
 SECTION 3.  EXPIRATION.  The advisory panel established
 under this Act is abolished and this Act expires September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2367 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 2, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2367 on May 27, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 1,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2367 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor