82R22229 ALB-F By: Quintanilla, Chisum, Margo, Garza, H.B. No. 2369 et al. A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the accreditation of training programs and examinations for certain emergency medical services personnel. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 773.050, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to read as follows: (b-1) A paramedic education course or training program is not required to be accredited by a national organization before January 1, 2014, unless, not later than September 1, 2012, the department sets an earlier date in accordance with a recommendation of the advisory council established under Section 773.012. (b-2) Not later than January 1, 2013, the department shall partner with a testing entity that administers an examination that qualifies the examinee for licensure as a paramedic. The department may not reimburse the testing entity for administering an examination, but the testing entity may charge a fee to an examinee. This subsection expires January 1, 2015. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011.