Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2376 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2376


 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of plumbing.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 1301.002(9-a) and (11), Occupations
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (9-a) "Responsible master plumber" means a person
 licensed as a master plumber under this chapter who:
 (A)  allows the person's master plumber license to
 be used by one plumbing company for the purpose of offering and
 performing plumbing work under the person's master plumber license;
 (B)  is authorized to obtain permits for plumbing
 work;
 (C)  assumes responsibility for plumbing work
 performed under the person's license; [and]
 (D)  has submitted a certificate of insurance as
 required by Section 1301.3576; and
 (E)  has completed a training program required by
 Section 1301.3576.
 (11)  "Water supply protection specialist" means a
 person who holds an endorsement issued by the board to engage in
 [the inspection, in connection with health and safety laws,
 including ordinances, of]:
 (A)  customer service inspections, as defined by
 rule of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality [the plumbing
 of a public water system distribution facility]; and [or]
 (B)  the installation, service, and repair of
 plumbing associated with the use and distribution use of rainwater
 to supply a plumbing fixture, appliance, or irrigation system
 [customer-owned plumbing connected to the water distribution lines
 of a public water system].
 SECTION 2.  Section 1301.304, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Unless a threat to health or safety exists, the board
 may choose to not investigate a complaint in which the person filing
 the complaint and the person who is the subject of the complaint
 are engaged in litigation related to the subject matter of the
 complaint until the outcome of the litigation is finally determined
 if the board determines the complaint process is being abused.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1301.3565, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (a-1) and (e-1) and amending Subsection (b)
 to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A person may not design a multipurpose residential
 fire protection sprinkler system for installation under this
 section unless the person:
 (1)  is licensed under this chapter as a master
 plumber; and
 (2)  holds an endorsement issued under this section.
 (b)  The board shall issue an endorsement as a multipurpose
 residential fire protection sprinkler specialist to a person who:
 (1)  holds the license described by Subsection (a);
 (2)  applies to the board on a form prescribed by the
 board;
 (3)  pays a fee set by the board;
 (4)  presents evidence satisfactory to the board of
 successful completion of a training program approved by the board
 that provides the training necessary for the proper design and
 installation of a multipurpose residential fire protection
 sprinkler system as required by the applicable codes and standards
 recognized by the state; and
 (5)  passes an examination required by the board.
 (e-1)  Notwithstanding any other law, a master plumber who
 holds an endorsement under this section is not required to hold a
 license or registration issued by another state agency in order to
 design a multipurpose residential fire protection sprinkler system
 for installation under this section.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1301.3576, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1301.3576.  CERTIFICATE OF INSURANCE AND TRAINING FOR
 RESPONSIBLE MASTER PLUMBER. Before a master plumber works as a
 responsible master plumber [When a person is issued a master
 plumber's license], the master plumber [person] must:
 (1)  provide the board with a certificate of insurance
 that meets the requirements of Section 1301.552; and
 (2)  present evidence satisfactory to the board of
 successful completion of a training program approved or
 administered by the board regarding the laws and rules applicable
 to the operation of a plumbing business in this state [before the
 person works as a responsible master plumber].
 SECTION 5.  Section 1301.552, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1301.552.  CERTIFICATE OF INSURANCE FOR PLUMBING PERMIT
 IN POLITICAL SUBDIVISION. A political subdivision that requires a
 responsible master plumber or an agent of a responsible master
 plumber [plumbing contractor] to obtain a permit before performing
 plumbing in the political subdivision shall verify through the
 board's Internet website, or by contacting the board by telephone,
 that the responsible master plumber [plumbing contractor] has on
 file with the board a certificate of insurance. The certificate of
 insurance must:
 (1)  be written by an insurer authorized to engage in
 the [a company licensed to do] business of insurance in this state
 or an eligible surplus lines insurer, as defined by Section
 981.002, Insurance Code;
 (2)  provide for commercial general liability
 insurance for the responsible master plumber for a claim for
 property damage or bodily injury, regardless of whether the claim
 arises from negligence or on a contract; and
 (3)  provide coverage of not less than $300,000 for all
 claims arising in a one-year period.
 SECTION 6.  Section 1301.3565, Occupations Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies only to the installation of a multipurpose
 residential fire protection sprinkler system that is designed on or
 after the effective date of this Act.  The installation of a
 multipurpose residential fire protection sprinkler system that is
 designed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect immediately preceding the effective date of this Act,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  Not later than December 31, 2011, the Texas State
 Board of Plumbing Examiners shall develop the curriculum and adopt
 rules for the approval or administration of the training program
 required by Section 1301.3576(2), Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 8.  Section 1301.3576, Occupations Code, as amended
 by this Act, does not apply to a master plumber who, on or before
 January 1, 2012, provides the Texas State Board of Plumbing
 Examiners with a certificate of insurance that meets the
 requirements of Section 1301.552, Occupations Code, as amended by
 this Act, and that is effective on January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 9.  Section 1301.552, Occupations Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies only to a permit issued on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A permit issued before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 permit is issued, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2376 was passed by the House on April
 7, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2376 on May 16, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 105, Nays 37,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2376 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 10, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor