Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2383 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 2383
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 16, 2011;
 May 16, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 19, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study regarding the reenactment of the franchise tax
 credit or providing other incentives for certain research and
 development activities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 171, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 171.215 to read as follows:
 Sec. 171.215.  STUDY OF INCENTIVES FOR RESEARCH AND
 DEVELOPMENT ACTIVITIES. (a) The Legislative Budget Board shall
 conduct a study of:
 (1)  the costs and benefits to the state of reenacting
 the tax credit for research and development activities in effect
 under Subchapter O before the repeal of that subchapter by Chapter 1
 (H.B. 3), Acts of the 79th Legislature, 3rd Called Session, 2006;
 and
 (2)  the types of research and development incentives
 available in other states.
 (b)  The Legislative Budget Board may seek the assistance of
 other state agencies in conducting the study, but the study must be
 completed using existing resources available to the Legislative
 Budget Board and any assisting agencies.
 (c)  The Legislative Budget Board shall report the results of
 the study to the legislature not later than January 1, 2013.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *