By: Menendez (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2387 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011; May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental Relations; May 20, 2011, rereferred to Committee on International Relations and Trade; May 21, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 21, 2011, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the selection, compensation, and duties of the general counsel to an appraisal district. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 6.05, Tax Code, is amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (j) to read as follows: (d) The chief appraiser is entitled to compensation as provided by the budget adopted by the board of directors. The chief appraiser's compensation may not be directly or indirectly linked to an increase in the total market, appraised, or taxable value of property in the appraisal district. The chief appraiser may employ and compensate professional, clerical, and other personnel as provided by the budget, with the exception of a general counsel to the appraisal district. (j) The board of directors of an appraisal district may employ a general counsel to the district to serve at the will of the board. The general counsel shall provide counsel directly to the board and perform other duties and responsibilities as determined by the board. The general counsel is entitled to compensation as provided by the budget adopted by the board. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. * * * * *