Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2396 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: McClendon (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2396
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 20, 2011, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2396 By:  Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the pledge of advanced transportation district sales
 and use taxes to certain bonds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 451.702, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (a) and (l) and adding Subsection (l-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The board of an authority in which the sales and use tax
 is imposed at a rate of one-half of one percent and in which the
 principal municipality has a population of more than 1.3 million
 [700,000] may order an election to create an advanced
 transportation district within the authority's boundaries and to
 impose a sales and use tax for advanced transportation and mobility
 enhancement under this subchapter. If approved at the election,
 the rate of the sales and use tax for advanced transportation and
 mobility enhancement shall be set by the governing body of the
 district at a rate of:
 (1)  one-eighth of one percent;
 (2)  one-fourth of one percent;
 (3)  three-eighths of one percent; or
 (4)  one-half of one percent.
 (l)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter,
 the [The] governing body of a [the] district may, by order or
 resolution, without the necessity of an election specifically
 concerning the matter:
 (1)  pledge the sales and use tax proceeds identified
 in Subsection (f) from a sales and use tax imposed by an election
 held under this section after May 21, 1999, to one or more series of
 sales and use tax revenue bonds issued under Subchapter H, subject
 to Subsection (l-1); and
 (2)  enter into an agreement or contractual arrangement
 under Subsection (k) [without the necessity of an election].
 (l-1)  The governing body of a district may not pledge sales
 and use tax proceeds under Subsection (l) unless the board has
 conducted a public hearing concerning the issuance of the bonds to
 which the proceeds are pledged and published notice of the hearing
 at least 14 days before the date of the hearing in a newspaper of
 general circulation in the principal municipality of the authority.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *