H.B. No. 2560 AN ACT relating to transporting a foster child in a vehicle where a handgun is in the possession of a foster parent licensed to carry a concealed handgun. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 42.042, Human Resources Code, is amended by adding Subsection (e-2) to read as follows: (e-2) The department may not prohibit the foster parent of a child who resides in the foster family's home from transporting the child in a vehicle where a handgun is present if the handgun is in the possession and control of the foster parent and the foster parent is licensed to carry the handgun under Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Government Code. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2560 was passed by the House on May 13, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 2, 2 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2560 on May 25, 2011, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 2560 on May 28, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2560 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 23, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 2560 on May 28, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 23, Nays 8. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor