Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2603 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 2603
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 16, 2011;
 May 16, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 19, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2;
 May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2603 By:  Jackson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the distribution of universal service funds to certain
 small and rural local exchange companies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 56.031, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 56.031.  ADJUSTMENTS:  TEXAS HIGH COST UNIVERSAL
 SERVICE PLAN. The commission may revise the monthly per line
 support amounts to be made available from the Texas High Cost
 Universal Service Plan [and from the Small and Rural Incumbent
 Local Exchange Company Universal Service Plan at any time after
 September 1, 2007,] after notice and an opportunity for
 hearing.  In determining appropriate monthly per line support
 amounts, the commission shall consider the adequacy of basic rates
 to support universal service.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 56, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 56.032 to read as follows:
 Sec. 56.032. ADJUSTMENTS: SMALL AND RURAL INCUMBENT LOCAL
 EXCHANGE COMPANY UNIVERSAL SERVICE PLAN. (a)  For purposes of this
 section, "consumer price index" means the Consumer Price Index for
 All Urban Consumers, as published by the federal Bureau of Labor
 Statistics of the United States Department of Labor.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsections (c), (d), (e), and
 (f), the commission may revise the monthly support amounts to be
 made available from the Small and Rural Incumbent Local Exchange
 Company Universal Service Plan by revising the monthly per line
 support amounts, after notice and an opportunity for hearing.  In
 determining appropriate monthly per line support amounts, the
 commission shall consider the adequacy of basic rates to support
 universal service.
 (c)  On the written request of a small or rural incumbent
 local exchange company that receives monthly per line support
 amounts, the commission shall disburse funds to the company in
 fixed monthly amounts based on the company's annualized amount of
 recovery for the calendar year ending on December 31, 2010. A
 company may submit only one request under this subsection and must
 submit the request on or before December 31, 2011.
 (d)  On the written request of a small or rural incumbent
 local exchange company that is not an electing company under
 Chapter 58 or 59, the commission annually shall set the company's
 monthly support amounts for the following 12 months by dividing by
 12 the annualized support amount calculated under this subsection.
 The commission shall calculate the annualized amount:
 (1)  for the initial 12-month period for which a
 company makes an election under this subsection, by:
 (A)  determining the annualized support amount
 calculated for the requestor in the final order issued by the
 commission in Docket No. 18516; and
 (B)  adjusting the support amount determined
 under Paragraph (A) at the beginning of each calendar year by a
 factor equal to the most recent consumer price index published at
 that time, beginning with the 1999 calendar year and ending in the
 year the company makes an election under this subsection; and
 (2)  for the 12-month period following the initial
 period for which a company made an election under this subsection
 and for subsequent 12-month periods, by adjusting the most recent
 annualized support amount calculated by the commission by a factor
 equal to the percentage change in the consumer price index for the
 most recent 12-month period.
 (e)  If a company elects to receive monthly support amounts
 under Subsection (d), the commission, on its own motion or on the
 written request of the company, may initiate a proceeding to
 recalculate the most recent annualized support amount to be used as
 the basis for adjustment for a subsequent 12-month period under
 Subsection (d)(2). If, based on the recalculation, the commission
 by order adjusts a company's most recent annualized support amount,
 the adjusted support amount supersedes the annualized support
 amount calculated in accordance with Subsection (d).
 (f)  The commission shall administratively review requests
 filed under Subsections (c) and (d). Except for good cause, the
 commission shall approve the request not later than the 60th day
 after the date the commission determines the company is eligible
 and has met all the procedural requirements under this subchapter.
 (g)  This section does not affect the commission's authority
 under Chapter 53 or this chapter.
 (h)  This section and any monthly support amount approved
 under this section expire on September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 3.  Effective September 1, 2013, Section 56.031,
 Utilities Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 56.031.  ADJUSTMENTS. The commission may revise the
 monthly per line support amounts to be made available from the Texas
 High Cost Universal Service Plan and from the Small and Rural
 Incumbent Local Exchange Company Universal Service Plan at any time
 after September 1, 2007, after notice and an opportunity for
 hearing.  In determining appropriate monthly per line support
 amounts, the commission shall consider the adequacy of basic rates
 to support universal service.
 SECTION 4.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *