Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2615 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Veasey (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 2615
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 10, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of information on financial literacy
 resources to the public.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 14, Finance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 14.1025 to read as follows:
 Sec. 14.1025.  FINANCIAL LITERACY PROGRAM INFORMATION. (a)
 In this section:
 (1)  "Financial literacy" means proficiency at
 managing personal finances.
 (2)  "Health and human services agencies" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 531.001, Government Code.
 (b)  The commissioner shall collect information on programs,
 including classes, and other resources available to the public that
 focus on teaching financial literacy, compile the information into
 a one-page document, and post the document on the office's Internet
 website.
 (c)  A health and human services agency shall ensure that the
 document under Subsection (b) is offered to persons who receive
 services from the agency at locations at which those persons
 frequently access services provided by the agency.
 (d)  The commissioner shall periodically update the
 information contained in the document described by Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  The Office of Consumer Credit Commissioner shall
 produce and publish on the office's Internet website the document
 required by Section 14.1025, Finance Code, as added by this Act, not
 later than December 1, 2011.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *