Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2669 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 4, 2011      TO: Honorable Rick Hardcastle, Chair, House Committee on Agriculture & Livestock      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2669 by Miles (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to study urban farming.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2669, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($176,516) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 4, 2011





  TO: Honorable Rick Hardcastle, Chair, House Committee on Agriculture & Livestock      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2669 by Miles (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to study urban farming.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Rick Hardcastle, Chair, House Committee on Agriculture & Livestock
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2669 by Miles (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to study urban farming.), As Introduced

 Honorable Rick Hardcastle, Chair, House Committee on Agriculture & Livestock 

 Honorable Rick Hardcastle, Chair, House Committee on Agriculture & Livestock 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2669 by Miles (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to study urban farming.), As Introduced

HB2669 by Miles (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to study urban farming.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2669, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($176,516) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2669, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($176,516) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2012 ($92,258)   2013 ($84,258)   2014 $0   2015 $0   2016 $0    


2012 ($92,258)
2013 ($84,258)
2014 $0
2015 $0
2016 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2011   2012 ($92,258) 1.0   2013 ($84,258) 1.0   2014 $0 0.0   2015 $0 0.0   2016 $0 0.0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2011   2012 ($92,258) 1.0   2013 ($84,258) 1.0   2014 $0 0.0   2015 $0 0.0   2016 $0 0.0  


2012 ($92,258) 1.0
2013 ($84,258) 1.0
2014 $0 0.0
2015 $0 0.0
2016 $0 0.0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would create the Urban Farm Advisory Committee to study and provide recommendations to the legislature regarding urban farms in the state. The advisory committee would be abolished on September 1, 2013. The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house; otherwise it would take effect September 1, 2011.

The bill would create the Urban Farm Advisory Committee to study and provide recommendations to the legislature regarding urban farms in the state. The advisory committee would be abolished on September 1, 2013.

The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house; otherwise it would take effect September 1, 2011.

Methodology

Based on information provided by the Department of Agriculture, one FTE would be required to implement the provisions of the bill.  The annual salary for this position would be $60,750, with estimated annual benefits costs of $16,925.  Related travel, equipment, and other operating expenses are estimated to be $14,583 in fiscal year 2012 and $6,583 in fiscal year 2013.

Based on information provided by the Department of Agriculture, one FTE would be required to implement the provisions of the bill.  The annual salary for this position would be $60,750, with estimated annual benefits costs of $16,925.  Related travel, equipment, and other operating expenses are estimated to be $14,583 in fiscal year 2012 and $6,583 in fiscal year 2013.

Technology

The cost for computer equipment, software, and data center services would be $4,700 in fiscal year 2012 and $1,200 in fiscal year 2013.

The cost for computer equipment, software, and data center services would be $4,700 in fiscal year 2012 and $1,200 in fiscal year 2013.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 551 Department of Agriculture

551 Department of Agriculture

LBB Staff: JOB, SZ, ZS, AH

 JOB, SZ, ZS, AH